Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1814750

EP1814750 - AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH A COLD ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.02.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BURK, Roland
Bubenhaldenstr. 86
70469 Stuttgart / DE
02 / DÜRR, Gottfried
Nachsommerweg 29
70437 Stuttgart / DE
03 / FEUERECKER, Günther
Winterlinger Weg 8
70567 Stuttgart / DE
04 / KOHL, Michael
Wilhelmstrasse 33
74321 Bietigheim / DE
05 / MANSKI, Ralf
Reinsburgstrasse 79
70197 Stuttgart / DE
06 / STRAUSS, Thomas
Neuffenstrasse 37
73274 Notzingen / DE
 [2007/32]
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/42]Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2007/32]Grauel, Andreas
Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05815167.115.11.2005
[2007/32]
WO2005EP12254
Priority number, dateDE2004105534016.11.2004         Original published format: DE102004055340
[2007/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006053721
Date:26.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1814750
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006
[2007/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1814750
Date:08.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00, F28D20/02, F28D1/053, F28D21/00, F28D20/00
[2013/33]
Former International [2007/32]B60H1/00, F28D20/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE MIT KÄLTESPEICHER[2007/32]
English:AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH A COLD ACCUMULATOR[2007/32]
French:SYSTEME DE CLIMATISATION A ACCUMULATEUR DE FROID[2007/32]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2007National basic fee paid 
18.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/32]
22.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.07.2013
25.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.11.2013Fee for grant paid
12.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.09.2014   
VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES
8, rue Louis Lormand
La Verrière
78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR
 [2014/42]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.09.2014No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
29.09.2014No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
19.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.02.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition03.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1134/18
25.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
30.07.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/31]
09.10.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.11.2005
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT15.11.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/29]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT15.11.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/28]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT15.11.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/25]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT15.11.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/12]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT15.11.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/48]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
GB15.11.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE15.11.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU15.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/24]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004093889  (BUREAU CATHY ET AL) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0050]; figures 1,3-10 *;
 [A]US5644929  (TANAKA ET AL) [A] 3,4,8 * column 6, line 26 - line 45; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2004104020  (HALLER REGINE ET AL) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 *