Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1824575 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1824575



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1601
24.10.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
24.10.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
24.10.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
19.10.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
13.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
02.06.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
02.06.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
02.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
12.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.03.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
16.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Opposition 3
02.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.12.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.12.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.07.2015 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
20.03.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
20.03.2015 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.03.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2014 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 35
12.11.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.11.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.11.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.2014 Claims Appeal 1
20.10.2014 Claims Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
20.10.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
24.09.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
24.09.2014 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 3
19.09.2014 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
19.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
16.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
16.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
04.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
21.03.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
18.03.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.02.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.11.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.10.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
31.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.08.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 4
27.08.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 3
27.08.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 9
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 9
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 10
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 3
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 2
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 6
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 3
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 10
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 18
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 5
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 8
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 6
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 7
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 7
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 4
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 2
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 7
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 10
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 7
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 4
27.08.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 3
27.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.08.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
23.08.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
18.07.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.07.2012 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
04.07.2012 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 3
04.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.07.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
25.06.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
27.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.04.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.04.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 2
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Claims Appeal 2
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Description Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
19.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
01.03.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
23.02.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.02.2012 Processing of an appeal Opposition 2
20.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.02.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
20.12.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
20.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
10.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Annex Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
14.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 63
14.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
14.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
14.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
14.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
14.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.10.2011 General authorisation Opposition 1
13.10.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
12.10.2011 General authorisation Opposition 1
12.10.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
07.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
08.04.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.04.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
21.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.10.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
19.10.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
19.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
19.10.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
27.08.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
23.06.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.06.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.06.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.06.2009 Request for documents Opposition 1
05.05.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.05.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
04.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.05.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.05.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
01.05.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
01.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
01.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Opposition 2
30.04.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.04.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
30.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.04.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.04.2009 Request for documents Opposition 1
09.04.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 21
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.07.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.06.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.06.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
08.02.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.02.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.02.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
31.01.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.01.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 3
08.10.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.08.2007 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
07.08.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.08.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.07.2007 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.07.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.07.2007 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.07.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
05.07.2007 Annex Search / examination 3
05.07.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
20.04.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.12.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.10.2006 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.10.2006 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.10.2006 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
06.10.2006 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.10.2006 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.06.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.06.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.06.2006 Priority document Search / examination 37
15.06.2006 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 35
22.12.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.12.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 1
22.12.2005 Description International Searching Authority 30
22.12.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 3