Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1937199

EP1937199 - MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Argentum Medical, LLC
2571 Kaneville Court
Geneva, IL 60134 / US
[2013/42]
Former [2011/31]For all designated states
Argentum Medical, LLC
3700 North Lake Shore Drive
Chicago, IL 60613 / US
Former [2008/27]For all designated states
Argentum Medical, LLC
3700 North Lake Shore Drive
Chicago, IL 60613 / US
For all designated states
Argentum International, LLC
36 Lake Rabun Road
Lakemont, GA 30552-2208 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FLICK, Bartholemew, A.
P.O. Box 429
36 Lake Rabun Road
Lakemont, GA 30552 / US
02 / SILVER, Gregg
3700 North Lake Shore Drive
Chicago, IL 60613 / US
03 / MILLER, Thomas
240 81st Street
Willowbrook, IL 60527 / US
 [2013/11]
Former [2008/27]01 / FLICK, Bartholemew, A.
P.O. Box 429 36 Lake Rabun Road
Lakemont, GA 30552 / US
02 / SILVER, Gregg
3700 North Lake Shore Drive
Chicago, IL 60613 / US
03 / MILLER, Thomas
240 81st Street
Willowbrook, IL 60527 / US
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2011/17]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2011/13](deleted)
...
Former [2009/36]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2008/27]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date05815831.221.10.2005
[2008/27]
WO2005US37921
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007046806
Date:26.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1937199
Date:02.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007
[2008/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1937199
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.04.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00
[2008/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2008/27]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE[2008/27]
French:DISPOSITIF MEDICAL[2008/27]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2008National basic fee paid 
23.04.2008Search fee paid 
23.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/27]
03.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
05.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.09.2012Fee for grant paid
28.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013  17.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/27]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013  17.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2015/17]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013  17.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate
Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
DE-70174 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/03]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013   
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate
Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
17.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0087/16
24.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200905   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2010
31.10.201107   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2012
31.10.201208   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.10.2005
CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
TR13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
LU21.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
TR13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2014/25]CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2014/09]CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/52]CY13.03.2013
CZ13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/50]CZ13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
PL13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/48]EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/47]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/38]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT13.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO03090654  (ARGENTUM RES INC [US]; FLICK BARTHOLEMEW A [US]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2004049145  (FLICK A BART [US]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO03057307  (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]; LOCKWOOD JEFFREY S [US]; PETROSENKO ROBERT) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, line 14 - line 23 * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 18; figures 1-3 *
International search[A]US2004049145