blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1812167

EP1812167 - JET OUTLET ELEMENT FOR SANITARY FITTINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
08.11.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hansgrohe SE
Auestraße 5-9
77761 Schiltach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]For all designated states
Hansgrohe SE
Auestrasse 5-9
77761 Schiltach / DE
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
Hansgrohe AG
Auestrasse 5 - 9
77761 Schiltach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HAHN, Arno
Im Ahornweg 3
77761 Schiltach / DE
02 / BLATTNER, Joachim
Lindenstrasse 9
77716 Haslach / DE
03 / KINLE, Ulrich
Rothaldenstrasse 21
77773 Schenkenzell / DE
04 / ARMBRUSTER, Jochen
Eduard-Trautwein-Strasse 14
77709 Wolfach / DE
 [2007/31]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstraße 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/07]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2007/31]Ruff, Michael
Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05815941.915.11.2005
[2007/31]
WO2005EP12195
Priority number, dateDE2004105607415.11.2004         Original published format: DE102004056074
[2007/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2006050987
Date:18.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1812167
Date:01.08.2007
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1812167
Date:31.12.2014
Language:DE
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2006
ClassificationIPC:B05B1/04, B05B1/34, B05B1/32, E03C1/04
[2014/31]
CPC:
E03C1/0404 (EP,US); B05B1/044 (EP,US); B05B1/326 (EP,US);
B05B1/34 (US); B05B1/3402 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2007/31]B05B1/04, B05B1/34, B05B1/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/31]
TitleGerman:STRAHLAUSTRITTSELEMENT FÜR SANITÄRARMATUREN[2007/31]
English:JET OUTLET ELEMENT FOR SANITARY FITTINGS[2007/31]
French:ELEMENT DE SORTIE A JET POUR DE LA ROBINETTERIE SANITAIRE[2007/31]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2007National basic fee paid 
30.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/31]
25.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2014Fee for grant paid
30.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.2015  09.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grohe AG
Feldmühleplatz 15
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias
karo IP Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2015  09.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grohe AG
Feldmühleplatz 15
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
(Karo IP Professionals)
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2015  09.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grohe AG
Feldmühleplatz 15
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2015   
Grohe AG
Feldmühleplatz 15
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
KNH Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
06.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.07.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
25.09.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/50]
29.10.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1906/17
08.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
25.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
26.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.11.2005
BG31.12.2014
CY31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
PT31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
TR31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
AT15.11.2015
GB15.11.2015
IE15.11.2015
LU15.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
[2018/37]
Former [2017/39]HU15.11.2005
BG31.12.2014
CY31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
TR31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
AT15.11.2015
GB15.11.2015
IE15.11.2015
LU15.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
Former [2017/19]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
AT15.11.2015
GB15.11.2015
IE15.11.2015
LU15.11.2015
Former [2016/47]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
GB15.11.2015
IE15.11.2015
LU15.11.2015
Former [2016/45]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
IE15.11.2015
LU15.11.2015
Former [2016/31]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
LU15.11.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/38]CZ31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/29]FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/24]FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/23]FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
Former [2015/20]LT31.12.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US1543009  (HEDGES EDWARD G) [A] 1,16,17 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2593357  (WYCLIFFE SPOONER WILLIAM) [X] 1,16 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 24; figure - *;
 [X]EP0319417  (PICARDIE SOC IND DE [FR]) [X] 1,17 * column 3, lines 35,36; figure - *;
 [X]US5249744  (RUTHENBERG DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5738280  (RUTHENBERG DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6170094  (WEISE GARY K [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13-15,18 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 20 * * figure - *;
 [XA]US2001018776  (KOREN PINHAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure - * [A] 8-12;
 [A]US6371392  (STEINMAN LEE E [US]) [A] 1,16,17* the whole document *;
 [X]US6382520  (HONES WILLIAM G [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,18,13 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048]; figure - * * paragraph [0069]; figures 16-18 *;
 [X]US6450418  (SIMPSON RICH F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [PXA]US2005086733  (LI H C [US], et al) [PX] 1,4-7,13-15 * paragraph [0034]; figure 8 * [PA] 8-11
by applicantDE2554723
 DE2619415
 US6170094
 US2001018776
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.