Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1759543

EP1759543 - METHOD FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/10]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS
[2008/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 10.10.2012  [2012/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ruckus Wireless, Inc.
880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2007/10]
Inventor(s)01 / KISH, William, c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc.
880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
02 / CHANAK, John, c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc.
880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
03 / GRAM, Charles, c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc.
880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
 [2007/34]
Former [2007/10]01 / KISH, William, Ruckus Wireless Inc.
883 N. Shoreline Blvd., Suite A-100
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / CHANAK, John, Ruckus Wireless Inc.
883 N. Shoreline Blvd., Suite A-100
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / GRAM, Charles, Ruckus Wireless Inc.
883 N. Shoreline Blvd., Suite A-100
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/10]Käck, Jürgen
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
D-86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date05816101.904.11.2005
[2007/10]
WO2005US39760
Priority number, dateUS20040625331P05.11.2004         Original published format: US 625331 P
US2005023219620.09.2005         Original published format: US 232196
[2007/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006052639
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1759543
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1759543
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/06
[2009/07]
Former International [2007/10]H04Q7/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/10]
Extension statesAL08.01.2007
BA08.01.2007
HR08.01.2007
MK08.01.2007
YU08.01.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES DATENDURCHSATZES IN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKEN[2008/34]
English:METHOD FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS[2008/34]
French:PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LES DEBITS DE DONNEES DANS DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION[2008/34]
Former [2007/10]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES DATENDURCHSATZES IN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKEN
Former [2007/10]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS
Former [2007/10]SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR AMELIORER LES DEBITS DE DONNEES DANS DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase08.01.2007National basic fee paid 
08.01.2007Search fee paid 
08.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/10]
28.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2008Fee for grant paid
31.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08021224.4  / EP2106178
EP10011798.5  / EP2278832
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT11.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
LU04.11.2009
[2012/41]
Former [2011/44]AT11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
HU12.08.2009
LU04.11.2009
Former [2011/32]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
HU12.08.2009
LU04.11.2009
Former [2011/22]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
LU04.11.2009
Former [2011/16]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2011/02]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2010/13]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2010/01]AT11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2004190477  (OLSON JONATHAN P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,16-18,22 * paragraphs [0065] , [0069] * [A] 4-8,10,19-21;
 [XY]  - TANG K ET AL, "Mac reliable broadcast ad hoc networks", MILCOM 2001. PROCEEDINGS. COMMUNICATIONS FOR NETWORK-CENTRIC OPERATIONS: CREATING THE INFORMATION FORCE. MCLEAN, VA, OCT. 28 - 30, 2001, IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011028), VOL. 1 OF 2, ISBN 0-7803-7225-5, pages 1008 - 1013, XP010579155 [X] 1-3,5-8,10,16-21,23 * page 1008, column L, line 20 - page 1010, column L, line 45 * [Y] 4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2001.985991
 [YA]  - TANG K ET AL, "MAC layer broadcast support in 802.11 wireless networks", MILCOM 2000. 21ST CENTURY MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 22-25 OCTOBER 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20001022), ISBN 0-7803-6521-6, pages 544 - 548, XP010532650 [Y] 4 [A] 1-3,5-10,16-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2000.905017
International search[X]US2004190477  (OLSON JONATHAN P [US], et al)
by applicantUS2004190477