Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838766

EP1838766 - METHOD FOR SURFACE-TREATMENT OF WATER ABSORBENT RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUMOTO, Makoto
Hamadaryo, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711242 / JP
02 / MITSUKAMI, Yoshiro
Hamadaryo, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711242 / JP
03 / IKEUCHI, Hiroyuki
14-12, Kitahirano-minamino-cho
Himeji-shi Hyogo, 6700887 / JP
04 / TORII, Kazushi
F-202, Hamadashataku, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711242 / JP
05 / IWAMURA, Taku
E-103, Hamadashataku, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711242 / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date05816469.009.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005JP23089
Priority number, dateJP2004035903310.12.2004         Original published format: JP 2004359033
JP2005024021422.08.2005         Original published format: JP 2005240214
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006062253
Date:15.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1838766
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838766
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/28, C08J7/18, C08J7/16, C08F265/02, A61L15/60
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE [2008/12]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON WASSERABSORBIERENDEM HARZ[2007/40]
English:METHOD FOR SURFACE-TREATMENT OF WATER ABSORBENT RESIN[2007/40]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE D'UNE RESINE ABSORBANT L'EAU[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2007National basic fee paid 
01.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
27.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2008Fee for grant paid
18.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0248437  (HAYASHIKANE SHIPBUILDING & ENG [JP]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 6, lines 9-14,51-56 *;
 [A]DE19619680  (BUNA SOW LEUNA OLEFINVERB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-25 * page 4, lines 10-23; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [A]JPH03767
 [A]  - R. C. BURR, "graft copolymers of starch and mixtures of acrylamide and acrylic acid", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1976), vol. 20, pages 3201 - 3204, XP002371636 [A] 1-25 * introduction *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1976.070201123
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910313), vol. 015, no. 104, Database accession no. (C - 0814), [A] 1-25 * abstract *