Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1846274

EP1846274 - DEVICE FOR THE PIVOTING CONNECTION OF A WIPER BLADE TO A WIPER ARM OF A WINDSCREEN WIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / KINNAERT, Erik
Liefdestraat 53 bus II
B-3700 Tienen / BE
02 / BEELEN, Hans
St. Jorislaan 213
B-3540 Herk de Stad / BE
 [2007/43]
Application number, filing date05817209.912.12.2005
[2007/43]
WO2005EP56681
Priority number, dateDE2005100518403.02.2005         Original published format: DE102005005184
DE2005101648508.04.2005         Original published format: DE102005016485
[2007/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006081893
Date:10.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1846274
Date:24.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1846274
Date:26.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/40
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM GELENKIGEN VERBINDEN EINES WISCHBLATTS MIT EINEM WISCHARM EINES SCHEIBENWISCHERS[2007/43]
English:DEVICE FOR THE PIVOTING CONNECTION OF A WIPER BLADE TO A WIPER ARM OF A WINDSCREEN WIPER[2007/43]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR RELIER DE FACON ARTICULEE UN BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE A UN BRAS D'ESSUIE-GLACE D'UN SYSTEME D'ESSUIE-GLACE[2007/43]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2007National basic fee paid 
03.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/43]
02.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2010Fee for grant paid
01.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.12.2009Request for further processing filed
30.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
TR26.05.2010
BG26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
HU27.11.2010
AT12.12.2010
LU12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/47]BG26.05.2010
CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
TR26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
HU27.11.2010
AT12.12.2010
LU12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/44]BG26.05.2010
CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
HU27.11.2010
AT12.12.2010
LU12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/42]BG26.05.2010
CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
HU27.11.2010
AT12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/41]BG26.05.2010
CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
AT12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/11]CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
AT12.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/48]CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/36]CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/12]CY26.05.2010
CZ26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
Former [2011/08]CY26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
NL26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT27.09.2010
Former [2011/05]CY26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
Former [2011/04]FI26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
PL26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
Former [2011/02]FI26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[XDA]WO0240328  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [XD] 16,18 * figures 1-5,20,21 * * page 10, line 29 - page 13, line 27 * [A] 1,17;
 [XA]DE10320930  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 16,18 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * [A] 1,17;
 [XA]US6530111  (KOTLARSKI THOMAS [DE]) [X] 16 * column A; figure - * [A] 1,17,18
by applicantWO0240328
 DE10347637