Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1796919

EP1796919 - FLOOR PANEL IMITATING A WOOD PATTERN ON ITS SURFACE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
Z.I. Bourmicht 10b Rue des Mérovingiens
8070 Bertrange / LU
[2016/12]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
Z.I. Bourmicht 10b Rue des Mérovingiens
8070 Bertrange / LU
Former [2007/25]For all designated states
Flooring Industries Ltd.
West Block, IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / NOLLET, Oke
Coupure 150
9000 Gent / BE
02 / NAEYAERT, Christophe
Weststraat 3A
8490 Jabbeke / BE
 [2010/49]
Former [2010/48]01 / NOLLET, Oke
Coupure 150
B-9000 Gent / BE
02 / NAEYAERT, Christophe
Weststraat 3A
B-8490 Jabbeke / BE
Former [2007/25]01 / NOLLET, Oke
Ter Venne 24
B-9880 Aalter / BE
02 / NAEYAERT, Christophe
Weststraat 3A
B-8490 Jabbeke / BE
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2014/30]
Former [2010/52]Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Former [2010/49]Schacht, Benny Marcel Croneel , et al
Unilin Industries, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
Former [2007/25]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date05817793.209.12.2005
[2007/25]
WO2005EP13411
Priority number, dateBE2004000061816.12.2004         Original published format: BE 200400618
US20050672868P20.04.2005         Original published format: US 672868 P
[2007/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006063803
Date:22.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1796919
Date:20.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006
[2007/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1796919
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1796919
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:B44B5/02, E04F15/02, B44C5/04, E04F15/10, B44F9/02, B44F1/08
[2012/37]
Former International [2007/25]B44C5/04, B44F9/02, E04F15/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/12]
Former [2007/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIN HOLZMUSTER AUF IHRER FLÄCHE IMITIERENDE FUSSBODENPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2007/25]
English:FLOOR PANEL IMITATING A WOOD PATTERN ON ITS SURFACE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING[2007/25]
French:PANNEAU DE RECOUVREMENT DE SOL ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE RECOUVREMENT DE SOL[2007/25]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2007National basic fee paid 
20.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/25]
10.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.01.2013Fee for grant paid
07.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08011844.1  / EP2050582
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014  19.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Spanolux SA
Z.I. Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
De Vries & Metman, et al
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 [2015/09]
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014   
Spanolux SA
Z.I. Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
De Vries & Metman, et al
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
16.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2015
16.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.10.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.02.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.12.2005
AT12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.12.2013
LU09.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.12.2013
LU09.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2015/30]AT12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.12.2013
LU09.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.12.2013
LU09.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
LU09.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
LU09.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
IT12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT12.06.2013
ES23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT12.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1482085  (ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES, INC.) [Y] 1-24 * see abstract; paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006]; claims 1-18 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0079] *;
 [Y]DE2833066  (SCOTT PAPER CO.) [Y] 1-24,28 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1; example 2 *;
 [XY]DE20317527U  (FLOORING INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 27,29-40,42-44,46,47 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * [Y] 4-24,28,41,45,48;
 [A]WO02058924  (SHAW INDUSTRIES, INC.) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5662977  (PATRICK LEON SPAIN ET AL.) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1052116  (DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO9747834  (UNILIN BEHEER B.V.) [YD] 41,45 * see abstract; page 15, paragraph 3; figures 10,22,23 * * page 26, line 32 - page 27, line 25 *;
 [Y]WO0200449  (BAUER, JÖRG., R.) [Y] 48 * see abstract; page 4 - page 7, line L; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE3802396  (TOKIWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.) [A] 27-48 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6013350  (DAIZO MIZUNO) [A] 27-48 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO0196688  (UNILIN BEHEER B.V. BESLOTEN VENOOTSCHAP) [AD] 27-48 * the whole document *
OppositionWO2006038867
 US4070987
 EP1228812
 DE10217919
    - H. SOINÉ, Laminate Flooring - Techniques and Technologies, HEINRICH WEMHÖNER GMBH & CO. KG, (1999), pages 7, 14 - 22-24