Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1842031

EP1842031 - SCANNING METHOD FOR AN ASYNCHRONOUS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING ASYNCHRONOUS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / FRESE, Volker
Stuttgarter Str. 69/2
71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
02 / SCHRUELLKAMP, Michael
Westendstr. 158
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
03 / MAYER, Thomas
Billinger Allee 2/2
A-72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / AT
 [2007/41]
Application number, filing date05819152.907.12.2005
[2007/41]
WO2005EP56572
Priority number, dateDE2005100272120.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005002721
[2007/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006076988
Date:27.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1842031
Date:10.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01D1/00
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2008/17]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABTASTVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN ASYNCHRONEN SENSOR UND ZUGEHÖRIGER ASYNCHRONER SENSOR[2007/41]
English:SCANNING METHOD FOR AN ASYNCHRONOUS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING ASYNCHRONOUS SENSOR[2007/41]
French:PROCEDE DE BALAYAGE POUR CAPTEUR ASYNCHRONE ET CAPTEUR ASYNCHRONE CORRESPONDANT[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2007National basic fee paid 
20.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
15.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.04.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1993/17
24.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE10054070  (DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GMBH) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE19704132  (AISIN SEIKI K.K., KARIYA, AICHI, JP) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 18 - line 32 *