Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1833662

EP1833662 - A method of making an interocular lens and a mold for carrying out this method. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/38]A METHOD OF THE MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPLANTABLE INTRAOCULAR PLANAR/CONVEX, BICONVEX, PLANAR/CONCAVE OR CONVEX/CONCAVE LENS, AN OPEN MOLD USED FOR THE EXECUTION OF THIS METHOD, AND A LENS MADE USING THIS METHOD.
[2008/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.K.Y. Polymers, Inc.
@
Pittsburgh, PA / US
[2009/09]
Former [2007/38]For all designated states
S.K.Y. Polymers, Inc.
@
Pittsburgh, PA / US
Inventor(s)01 / MICHALEK, Jiri
5.kvetna 31
140 00 Praha 4 / CZ
02 / VACIK, Jiri
Hokrova 853
140 00 Praha 4 / CZ
 [2007/38]
Representative(s)Pavlica, Tomas , et al
Traplová, Hakr, Kubát
Law and Patent Offices
Pristavni 24
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Pavlica, Tomas , et al
Traplová, Hakr, Kubát Law and Patent Offices Pristavni 24
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
Former [2007/38]Hak, Roman
Traplova - Hakr - Kubat, Pristavni 24
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
Application number, filing date05819390.509.12.2005
[2007/38]
WO2005CZ00093
Priority number, dateCZ2004000120510.12.2004         Original published format: CZ 20041205
[2007/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006060971
Date:15.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1833662
Date:19.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006
[2007/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1833662
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:B29D11/02, B29C41/04
[2007/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer intraokularen Linse und Form zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[2008/30]
English:A method of making an interocular lens and a mold for carrying out this method.[2008/30]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'une lentille intraoculaire et un moule pour l'exécution de ce procédé[2008/30]
Former [2007/38]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN INTRAOKULAREN PLANAREN/KONVEXEN, BIKONVEXEN, PLANAREN/KONKAVEN ODER KONVEXEN/KONKAVEN LINSE, ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS VERWENDETE OFFENE FORM UND UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS HERGESTELLTE LINSE
Former [2007/38]A METHOD OF THE MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPLANTABLE INTRAOCULAR PLANAR/CONVEX, BICONVEX, PLANAR/CONCAVE OR CONVEX/CONCAVE LENS, AN OPEN MOLD USED FOR THE EXECUTION OF THIS METHOD, AND A LENS MADE USING THIS METHOD.
Former [2007/38]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE LENTILLE IMPLANTABLE INTRAOCULAIRE PLANE/CONVEXE, BICONVEXE, PLANE/CONCAVE OU CONVEXE/CONCAVE, MOULE OUVERT UTILISE POUR L'EXÉCUTION DE CE PROCÉDÉ, ET LENTILLE RÉALISÉE À L'AIDE DE CE PROCÉDÉ
Entry into regional phase09.07.2007National basic fee paid 
09.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/38]
13.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/02]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/13]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/01]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[DAX]US5674283  (STOY VLADIMIR A [US]) [DA] 1 * figures 8,9; claim 5 * [X] 10-22;
 [AX]EP0328246  (SHEPHERD THOMAS H) [A] 1 * figure 2 * [X] 10-22;
 [AX]US2002082690  (SARBADHIKARI KAMAL K [US]) [A] 1 * figure 6 * [X] 10-22