Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839699

EP1839699 - CONNECTOR, TUBE ASSEMBLY, INFUSION TUBE SET, AND CONTAINER FOR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2014  [2014/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HISHIKAWA, Yoshinori, Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1727-1, Tsuijiarai, Showa-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 4093853 / JP
02 / YOKOTA, Takayuki, Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1727-1, Tsuijiarai, Showa-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 4093853 / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date05819651.022.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005JP23574
Priority number, dateJP2004037223822.12.2004         Original published format: JP 2004372238
JP2005000691313.01.2005         Original published format: JP 2005006913
[2007/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006068211
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1839699
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.06.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/02, A61M39/14
[2008/12]
Former International [2007/40]A61M39/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDER, SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG, INFUSIONSSCHLAUCHSET UND BEHÄLTER ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERWENDUNG[2007/40]
English:CONNECTOR, TUBE ASSEMBLY, INFUSION TUBE SET, AND CONTAINER FOR MEDICAL USE[2007/40]
French:CONNECTEUR, ENSEMBLE DE TUBES, JEU DE TUBES D'INFUSION ET CONTENANT A USAGE MEDICAL[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2007Translation filed 
21.06.2007National basic fee paid 
21.06.2007Search fee paid 
21.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
14.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/49]
29.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002010437  (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9944655  (MINIMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]US5290248  (BIERMAN STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2783717  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]US5582600  (LOH ERIC P [US]) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0856331  (ALARIS MEDICAL SYST INC [US]) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract *;
 [X]US6193697  (JEPSON STEVEN C [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2000107300  (BECTON DICKINSON CO);
 [A]JP2002035140  (TERUMO CORP);
 [A]JP3052138U