Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839552

EP1839552 - ELECTRIC BENDING ENDOSCOPE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KOITABASHI, Masanobu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / FURUKAWA, Tatsuya c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date05820060.122.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005JP23660
Priority number, dateJP2005000947417.01.2005         Original published format: JP 2005009474
[2007/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006075503
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1839552
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1839552
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)International search reportJP20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, G02B23/24
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/13]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES BIEGE-ENDOSKOP[2007/40]
English:ELECTRIC BENDING ENDOSCOPE DEVICE[2007/40]
French:ENDOSCOPE TORDU ELECTRIQUEMENT[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2007Translation filed 
29.06.2007National basic fee paid 
29.06.2007Search fee paid 
29.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
18.08.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.09.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
26.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2011Fee for grant paid
08.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2009
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0079525  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * * page 4 - page 5 *;
 [Y]US4793198  (MYER JON H [US]) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 42 * * figures 7-9 *;
 [Y]US5107080  (ROSEN MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1,8-10 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO9642078  (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,9,10 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4689449  (ROSEN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2003230535  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO);
 [A]JP2003316514  (FUJITSU COMPONENT LTD)