Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1829429

EP1829429 - METHOD FOR PROGRAMMING AN OPERATING DEVICE FOR LIGHTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2010/38]
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
TridonicAtco GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
Inventor(s)01 / JUEN, Reinhold
Sandgasse 4
A-6850 Dornbirn / AT
02 / KLIEN, Dietmar
Hirma 19
A-6841 Mäder / AT
03 / STRIETZEL, Carsten
Rebberggasse 22a
A-6800 Feldkirch / AT
 [2007/36]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2007/36]Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date05820227.620.12.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005EP13734
Priority number, dateDE2004106129420.12.2004         Original published format: DE102004061294
[2007/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006066884
Date:29.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1829429
Date:05.09.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1829429
Date:19.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/02
[2007/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PROGRAMMIERUNG EINES BETRIEBSGERÄTES FÜR LEUCHTMITTEL[2007/36]
English:METHOD FOR PROGRAMMING AN OPERATING DEVICE FOR LIGHTING DEVICES[2007/36]
French:PROCEDE POUR PROGRAMMER UN EQUIPEMENT D'ELEMENT D'ECLAIRAGE[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2007National basic fee paid 
10.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
05.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.03.2011
01.03.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2011Fee for grant paid
28.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10185228.3  / EP2276327
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.06.2013  25.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Helvar Oy Ab
Yrittäjäntie 23
03600 Karkkila / FI
Opponent's representative
Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
 [N/P]
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2013   
Helvar Oy Ab
Yrittäjäntie 23
03600 Karkkila / FI
Opponent's representative
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Antinkatu 3 C
00101 Helsinki / FI
26.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1816/15
17.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
24.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1816/15
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2005
CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
TR19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
LU20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
SE21.12.2018
[2019/34]
Former [2014/34]HU20.12.2005
CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
TR19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
LU20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2014/27]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
TR19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
LU20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2014/21]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
TR19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/48]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/47]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
IE20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/44]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/37]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/34]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
BG19.12.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/33]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/28]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
PL19.09.2012
RO19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
SK19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
Former [2013/22]CY19.09.2012
CZ19.09.2012
EE19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
IS19.01.2013
Former [2013/11]CY19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
LV19.09.2012
SI19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY19.09.2012
LT19.09.2012
Former [2013/08]LT19.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002158591  (RIBARICH THOMAS J ET AL) [X] 1,2,10,12,13,21 * paragraphs [0012] , [0023] , [0041]; figure 1 *;
 [XA]EP1422975  (COLOR KINETICS INCORPORATED) [X] 1,2,10,12 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * paragraph [0068]; claims 1-12 * [A] 3-9,11,13-21;
 [A]US2004217718  (KUMAR RUSSIKESH ET AL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - CONTENTI C ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Digitally addressable DALI dimming ballast", APEC 2002. 17TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. DALLAS, TX, MARCH 10 - 14, 2002, ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020310), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 17, ISBN 0-7803-7404-5, pages 936 - 942, XP010583030 [X] 1,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 13,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2002.989357