Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838993

EP1838993 - MULTIPURPOSE LIGHTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.11.2014  [2014/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / TYAGI, Vineet
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
02 / BALDRIGE, Jack
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
03 / CHATURVEDI, Utsawa
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
04 / MORRELL, Mark
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
05 / BAKER, Karl
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
06 / KETCHUM, Rebecca
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
07 / VALLABHANENI, Eswara
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
08 / HENNINGER, Georg
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Verweij, Petronella Danielle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/40]Golla, Anke Lucia
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date05820530.329.11.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005IB53955
Priority number, dateUS20040637371P17.12.2004         Original published format: US 637371 P
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006064388
Date:22.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1838993
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01J61/96
[2009/19]
Former International [2007/40]F21S/
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRZWECKBELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT[2007/40]
English:MULTIPURPOSE LIGHTING UNIT[2007/40]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE MULTIFONCTIONNEL[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2007National basic fee paid 
21.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/46]
03.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004055428  (HIERZER ANDREAS [AT]) [X] 1-45 * abstract * * page 4, line 22 - page 9, line 26 * * figure - *;
 [X]DE29906717U  (ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-45 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1171644  (SAUNIER DUVAL) [X] 1-4,9-14,24,25,27-32,35-41 * page 2 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2319079  (SIMONET BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-4,9-14,24,25,27-32,35-41 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4367432  (GLENNY ALFRED E T [NL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS19820006028