Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1833648

EP1833648 - PELLET TREATMENT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2012/35]
Former [2007/38]For all designated states
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY
Société Industrielle C
B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Inventor(s)01 / DAMME, Eric
Chaussée De Monstreux, 7
B-7181 Arquennes / BE
 [2007/38]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Postfach 70 04 25
81304 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
55, rue des Bruyères
1274 Howald / LU
Former [2007/38]Leyder, Francis
Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Application number, filing date05821649.020.12.2005
[2007/38]
WO2005EP56962
Priority number, dateEP2004010673420.12.2004         Original published format: EP 04106734
[2007/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006067146
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1833648
Date:19.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1833648
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:B29B13/06, B29B9/06, C08F6/00
[2007/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINHEIT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PELLETS[2007/38]
English:PELLET TREATMENT UNIT[2007/38]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER DES GRANULES[2007/38]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2007National basic fee paid 
15.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/38]
05.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2009Fee for grant paid
08.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  02.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited
Hawkslease
Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
King, Alex, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2012/44]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  02.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited
Hawkslease
Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
King, Alex, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
Former [2010/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009   
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
King, Alex, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey
Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.01.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
16.04.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.04.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
25.10.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/11]
22.12.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.06.2013Appeal received No.  T1393/13
14.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
25.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
25.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE20.12.2009
LU20.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
MC01.07.2010
DK31.12.2014
[2016/07]
Former [2015/22]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE20.12.2009
LU20.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
MC01.07.2010
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE20.12.2009
LU20.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
MC01.07.2010
Former [2011/22]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
IE20.12.2009
LU20.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
MC01.07.2010
Former [2011/02]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
IE20.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
MC01.07.2010
Former [2010/40]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC01.07.2010
Former [2010/13]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2010/01]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US5052123  (TISCHENDORF KLAUS J [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * columns 1-4; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE19729302  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * column 3 *;
 [A]US6270708  (GUROL ISMAIL MACIT [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19824788  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH01258911  ;
 [A]JPS6378707  ;
 [A]US3544525  (BALINT LASZLO J, et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900111), vol. 014, no. 013, Database accession no. (M - 918), [A] 1-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880817), vol. 012, no. 302, Database accession no. (M - 732), [A] 1-13 * abstract *