Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839397

EP1839397 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yoido-dong
Yongdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-010 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul 150-010 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Taek, Soo.
508-1402, Cheongoo Apt., Hosoo Maeul, Janghang-d.
Ilsan-gu, Goyang-si, Gyeongi-do 401-380 / KR
02 / KIM, Ho Won
113-906, Donga Echovill Apt., Sangwolgok-dong
Seongbook-gu, Seoul 136-120 / KR
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2007/40]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date05822647.327.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005KR04588
Priority number, dateKR2004011512629.12.2004         Original published format: KR 20040115126
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006071061
Date:06.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1839397
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search reportKR06.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/38
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesDE [2008/04]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT FINGERABDRUCKERKENNUNGSSENSOR[2007/40]
English:MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION SENSOR[2007/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2007National basic fee paid 
23.07.2007Search fee paid 
23.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
30.07.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.11.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/16]
01.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004208347  (BAHARAV IZHAK [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0010] , [0042] - [0044] - [0047] , [0050] , [0051] , [0054] , [0068] , [0081] , [0103] - [0106]; figures 16b,19a *;
 [Y]JP2001266108  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [X]US2003035568  (MITEV MITKO G [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2002030668  (HOSHINO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] - [0065] , [0094] - [0100]; figures 1,2a,2b,3a,3b,4a,4b,5b,13a *
International search[A]KR20040000954  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD);
 [A]KR20030040604  (SK TELETEC CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20010047126  (LG INF & COMM LTD [KR])