Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819789

EP1819789 - COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR CANS AND METHODS OF COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.05.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SWIMC LLC
101 West Prospect Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US
[2019/01]
Former [2010/40]For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461
Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US
Former [2007/34]For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
1101 South Third Street
Minneapolis, MN 55415 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'BRIEN, Robert, M.
163 Ridge Road
Monongahela, PA 15063 / US
02 / RARDON, Daniel, E.
5972 Alder Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US
03 / SPYNDA, Rachael, Ann
135 Weller Drive
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
04 / BARTLEY, George, K., III
168 Raymond Street
Burgettstown, PA 15021 / US
05 / EVANS, Richard, H.
1801 St. James Place
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date05825629.818.10.2005
[2007/34]
WO2005US37750
Priority number, dateUS20040620639P20.10.2004         Original published format: US 620639 P
[2007/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006045017
Date:27.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1819789
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006
[2007/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1819789
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:C09D151/08, B65D17/00
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DOSEN UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN[2007/34]
English:COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR CANS AND METHODS OF COATING[2007/34]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT POUR CANETTES ET PROCEDES DE REVETEMENT[2007/34]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2007National basic fee paid 
10.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
16.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2011Fee for grant paid
18.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11169890.8  / EP2420541
EP11169891.6  / EP2420542
EP15199749.1  / EP3037488
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.03.2012  23.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/26]
Opponent(s)01  15.03.2012  23.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2012/17]
Opponent(s)01  15.03.2012   
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
19.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1533/15
26.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
31.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1533/15
02.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
HU15.06.2011
IT15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
TR15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
PT17.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
IT15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
TR15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
PT17.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/29]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
DK15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
IT15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
BG15.09.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
PT17.10.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/10]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
RO15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
SK15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
PT17.10.2011
Former [2012/09]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
CZ15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
PT17.10.2011
Former [2012/08]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
EE15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
IS15.10.2011
Former [2012/05]AT15.06.2011
BE15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
NL15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT15.06.2011
CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
LV15.06.2011
SI15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY15.06.2011
FI15.06.2011
LT15.06.2011
GR16.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT15.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3991216  (CHRISTENSON ROGER M, et al) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB1513866  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC) [Y] 1-42 * page 4, line 18 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 5, line 31 - line 62 * * page 6, line 25 - line 38; example -; claim - *;
 [YD]US4647612  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US4692491  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5939482  (KRIESSMANN INGO [AT], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2152065  (INMONT CORP) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4600737  (GEORGALAS NICK [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * column 1, line 49 - line 51 *
by applicantUS4692491
 US3479310
 US4147679
 WO2006US60043