Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819435

EP1819435 - MULTIPHASE REACTION PROCESS USING MICROCHANNEL TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Velocys Inc.
7950 Corporate Boulevard Plain City
Ohio 43064 / US
[2007/34]
Inventor(s)01 / TONKOVICH, Anna, Lee
6493 Ballantrae Place
Dublin, Ohio 43016 / US
02 / HESSE, David John
193 Charleston Avenue
Columbus, Ohio 43214 / US
03 / NEAGLE, Paul
233 Apache Street
Westerville, Ohio 43081 / US
04 / LAMONT, Michael Jay
4877 Hawkstone Road
Hilliard, Ohio 43026 / US
05 / DALY, Francis, P.
188 North Franklin Street
Delaware, Ohio 43015 / US
06 / JAROSCH, Kai Tod Paul
839 Vernon Road
Bexley, Ohio 43209 / US
07 / STEVENSON, Richard
569 E. Gates Street
Columbus, Ohio 43206 / US
08 / SILVA, Laura, J.
5583 Dumfries Court West
Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Brand, Thomas Louis
TL Brand & Co
50 Eastcastle Street
London W1W 8EA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]Leidescher, Thomas , et al
Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Application number, filing date05826329.416.11.2005
[2007/34]
WO2005US41486
Priority number, dateUS20040628163P16.11.2004         Original published format: US 628163 P
US20050697900P08.07.2005         Original published format: US 697900 P
US20050727126P13.10.2005         Original published format: US 727126 P
US20050731596P27.10.2005         Original published format: US 731596 P
[2007/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006055609
Date:26.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1819435
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROKANALTECHNOLOGIE VERWENDENDER MEHRPHASIGER REAKTIONSPROZESS[2007/34]
English:MULTIPHASE REACTION PROCESS USING MICROCHANNEL TECHNOLOGY[2007/34]
French:PROCEDE REACTIONNEL MULTIPHASE FAISANT APPEL A UNE TECHNOLOGIE DE MICROCANAUX[2007/34]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2007National basic fee paid 
15.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
04.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]US6713036  (VANDEN BUSSCHE KURT M [US], et al) [X] 1-119 * column 3, line 29 - line 60 * * column 4, line 8 - line 27 * * column 7, line 20 - line 34 * * column 8, line 11 - line 45 * * claim - *;
 [X]US6252016  (WU RICHARD SHU-HUA [US], et al) [X] 1-119 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 67 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 55; figure .; example - *;
 [X]US2003159530  (HAAS ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-119 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0073] *;
 [X]US6305834  (SCHUBERT KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-119 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 32 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 48 * * column 5, line 7 - line 23 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 30; figure -; example . *;
 [X]US2003103879  (JAHN PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-119 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * * figure -; example 10 *;
 [X]WO2004037399  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [X] 1-119 * abstract * * page 9, line 13 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 27; figure 5; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2004103539  (VELOCYS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-119 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 11 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 33, paragraph 2 - page 37, paragraph 2 * * page 39, paragraph 2 - page 42, paragraph 2 * * page 45, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 50, paragraph 4 * * page 51, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2005060658  (VELOCYS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-119 * abstract * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 19 * * page 9, line 15 - page 11, line 24 * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 13 * * figure -; claim - *