EP1820333 - DEHUMIDIFIED EQUIPMENT HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKEY, Thomas F. 158 Dubonnet Road Tavernier, Florida 33070 / US | 02 /
NEICONI, Ovidiu 3638 Newport Avenue Boynton Beach, Florida 33436 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05847864.5 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US42836 | Priority number, date | US20040630350P | 23.11.2004 Original published format: US 630350 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006058265 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820333 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, G03B17/08, H05K5/02 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
G08B13/19619 (EP,US);
H05K5/0213 (US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
H05K5/0212 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | H04N5/225, G03B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFEUCHTETES GERÄTEGEHÄUSE | [2007/34] | English: | DEHUMIDIFIED EQUIPMENT HOUSING | [2007/34] | French: | LOGEMENT D'EQUIPEMENT ASSECHE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 15.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH08205007 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-8,10-14 * the whole document * [Y] 9,15-20; | [Y]US6061087 (SCHIELTZ STEVEN W [US], et al) [Y] 9,15-20* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH08205007 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]US6061087 (SCHIELTZ STEVEN W [US], et al) |