Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838781

EP1838781 - STYROL/BUTADIENE BLOCK COPOLYMER MIXTURES FOR SHRINK FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KNOLL, Konrad
Tristanstrasse 1
68199 Mannheim / DE
02 / STEININGER, Helmut
Dr.-Ernst-Kilb-Weg 15
67551 Worms / DE
03 / SCHUSTER, Michael
Gontardstr.31
68163 Mannheim / DE
04 / WAGNER, Daniel
Im Röhrich 67
67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
05 / MERKEL, Peter
Borkelwiese 12
67308 Zellertal / BE
 [2007/40]
Application number, filing date05849213.331.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005EP14166
Priority number, dateDE2005100163712.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005001637
[2007/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006074819
Date:20.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1838781
Date:03.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838781
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L53/02
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STYROL-BUTADIEN-BLOCKCOPOLYMERMISCHUNGEN FÜR SCHRUMPFFOLIEN[2007/40]
English:STYROL/BUTADIENE BLOCK COPOLYMER MIXTURES FOR SHRINK FILMS[2007/40]
French:MELANGES DE COPOLYMERES BLOCS STYRENE-BUTADIENE POUR FILMS RETRACTABLES[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2007National basic fee paid 
13.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2008Fee for grant paid
19.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2013/44]
Former [2011/45]CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/32]DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/02]DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/13]DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/01]DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP1498438  (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,10,11 * claims 1-5,17-20 * * page 14; examples A-7,A-8; table 2 *;
 [A]WO03046075  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, lines 22-27; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO9946330  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, lines 15-24,44,45; claims 1-8 * * page 3, line 44 * * page 4, lines 26-36 * * page 5, lines 14-31 *