Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819246

EP1819246 - IMPROVED BACK FINGER PORTION FOR GLOVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2010
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2010  [2010/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swany America Corp.
115 Corporate Drive
Johnstown, NY 12095 / US
[2007/34]
Inventor(s)01 / SON, Yeong, Chul
9 Windsor Drive
Gloversville, NY 12078 / US
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date05849469.129.11.2005
[2007/34]
WO2005US42876
Priority number, dateUS20040634267P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634267 P
[2007/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006062751
Date:15.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1819246
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.04.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A41D19/02
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER UNTERFINGERTEIL FÜR HANDSCHUHE[2007/34]
English:IMPROVED BACK FINGER PORTION FOR GLOVES[2007/34]
French:GANT PRESENTANT UNE PARTIE ARRIERE POUR LES DOIGTS AMELIOREE[2007/34]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2007National basic fee paid 
01.03.2007Search fee paid 
01.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
13.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/11]
29.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4000524  (RINEHART DIXIE L) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 44 - line 52; figures 1,9 *;
 [DY]US4654896  (RINEHART DIXIE L [US]) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5384083  (DAWN FREDERIC S [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 20 - line 24; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US1540718  (STURM FRANK X) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 18 - line 26; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5857216  (GOLD DANNY [HK]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 34 - line 39; figure - * * column 4, line 34 - line 55; claims 7,11,12,15,19,20,22 *;
 [YA]US2003106133  (NOVAK JERRY R [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0027]; figures 4,9 * [A] 11,12;
 [A]US2003208833  (GOLD DANNY [HK]) [A] * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US3377627  (HERMAN MADNICK)
International search[A]US1666023  (STURM FRANK X);
 [Y]US4000524  (RINEHART DIXIE L);
 [Y]US4654896  (RINEHART DIXIE L [US]);
 [A]US4831667  (TOWN ALLEN W [US]);
 [A]US5167038  (RINEHART DIXIE L [US])