Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838956

EP1838956 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / VALOUCH, Bernhard
Lerchenweg 2
75031 Eppingen / DE
02 / SCHUELER, Harald
Briandstr. 7
71522 Backnang / DE
 [2007/40]
Application number, filing date05850088.512.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005EP56666
Priority number, dateDE2005100142512.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005001425
[2007/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006074846
Date:20.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1838956
Date:03.10.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838956
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/24, F02D41/20, F02D41/26
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/16]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2007/40]
English:DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2007/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2007National basic fee paid 
13.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2008Fee for grant paid
16.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.02.2009
[2011/16]
Cited inInternational search[X]US6418913  (SCHMIDT ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 20 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 39 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2004086158  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 5 *;
 [A]DE10117809  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] - [0032] *;
 [A]DE10236820  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] - [0008] - [0010] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] , [0034] *;
 [DA]DE10213349  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0024] *;
 [DA]DE10244091  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] - [0010] *