Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1828557

EP1828557 - HOUSING FOR A COMPONENT OF AN EXHAUST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faurecia Emissions Control Technologies, Germany GmbH
Biberbachstrasse 9
86154 Augsburg / DE
[2012/24]
Former [2008/42]For all designated states
EMCON Technologies Germany (Augsburg) GmbH
Biberbachstrasse 9
86154 Augsburg / DE
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
ArvinMeritor Emissions Technologies GmbH
Biberbachstrasse 9
86154 Augsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STAMMEL, Reinhold
Hans-Adlhoch-Str. 4
86157 Augsburg / DE
 [2007/42]
Former [2007/36]01 / STAMMEL, Reinhold
Metzgplatz 3
86150 Augsburg / DE
Representative(s)Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/02]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/36]Sties, Jochen
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date05850238.607.12.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005EP13125
Priority number, dateDE2004105938109.12.2004         Original published format: DE102004059381
[2007/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006061211
Date:15.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1828557
Date:05.09.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1828557
Date:13.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/28, F01N13/14, F01N13/18, F01N1/24
[2012/01]
Former International [2007/36]F01N3/28, F01N7/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR [2007/49]
Former [2007/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN BAUTEIL EINER ABGASANLAGE[2007/36]
English:HOUSING FOR A COMPONENT OF AN EXHAUST SYSTEM[2007/36]
French:BOITIER POUR UN COMPOSANT D'UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2007National basic fee paid 
05.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
10.07.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.08.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
05.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2012Fee for grant paid
26.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  25.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Friedrich Boysen GmbH & Co. KG
Friedrich-Boysen-Strasse 14-17
D-72213 Altensteig / DE
Opponent's representative
Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013  25.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Friedrich Boysen GmbH & Co. KG
Friedrich-Boysen-Strasse 14-17
D-72213 Altensteig / DE
Opponent's representative
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2013/17]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013   
Friedrich Boysen GmbH & Co. KG
Friedrich-Boysen-Strasse 14-17
D-72213 Altensteig / DE
Opponent's representative
Thul, Stephan
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
19.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1195/16
12.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1195/16
08.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2007AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007BG   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007CZ   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007EE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007HU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007IS   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007LT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007LV   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007PL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007RO   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007SI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007SK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2007TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201006   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES24.09.2012
[2015/22]
Cited inInternational search[X]CH394713  (WOLF,DIETER; BARBY,JEAN) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 59 - line 62 * * page 2, line 13 - line 16 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0563843  (MARMITTE ZARA S.P.A) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2617903  (ROSI SA ETS) [X] 1,5 * page 4 - page 7 * * figure - *;
 [X]FR2854649  (PERU JEAN CLAUDE) [X] 1 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 36 *;
 [X]US5280142  (KELLER ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document *