Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1817689

EP1817689 - IMPROVED IMAGE ACQUISITION AND PROCESSING SYSTEMS FOR VEHICLE EQUIPMENT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentex Corporation
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
[2007/33]
Inventor(s)01 / STAM, Joseph, S.
3853 Hyder Ct.
Holland, MI 49424 / US
02 / BUSH, Gregory, S.
1318 Rosewood Avenue S.E.
Grand Rapids, MI 49406 / US
03 / DEBRUINE, Timothy, S.
620 Rosewood S.E.
Grand Rapids, MI 49406 / US
04 / WALSTRA, Eric, J.
941 Brownell S.E.
Grand Rapids, MI 49408 / US
 [2007/33]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2011/13]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2007/33]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05851654.314.11.2005
[2007/33]
WO2005US41318
Priority number, dateUS20040629108P18.11.2004         Original published format: US 629108 P
US20050710602P23.08.2005         Original published format: US 710602 P
US20050715315P08.09.2005         Original published format: US 715315 P
[2007/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006055541
Date:26.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1817689
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006
[2007/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1817689
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01C23/00, B60R1/00
[2012/10]
Former International [2008/12]G01C23/00
Former International [2007/33]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/33]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE SYSTEME ZUR BILDERFASSUNG UND VERARBEITUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGAUSRÜSTUNGSSTEUERUNG[2007/33]
English:IMPROVED IMAGE ACQUISITION AND PROCESSING SYSTEMS FOR VEHICLE EQUIPMENT CONTROL[2007/33]
French:SYSTEME AMELIORE D'ACQUISITION ET DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES POUR LA COMMANDE D'EQUIPEMENTS DE VEHICULES[2007/33]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2007National basic fee paid 
31.05.2007Search fee paid 
31.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/33]
24.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2014Fee for grant paid
30.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.2014  11.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Str. 80
80809 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wiedemann, Markus
Patentanwalt Ludwigstrasse 1
86150 Augsburg / DE
 02  11.12.2014  16.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstrasse 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kluth, Philipp
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 [2020/02]
Former [2015/04]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2014  11.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Str. 80
80809 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wiedemann, Markus
Patentanwalt Ludwigstrasse 1
86150 Augsburg / DE
 02  11.12.2014  16.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstrasse 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2014   
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Str. 80
80809 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wiedemann, Markus
Patentanwalt Ludwigstrasse 1
86150 Augsburg / DE
16.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1879/17
20.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.11.2005
AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
TR12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE14.11.2014
LU14.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE14.11.2014
LU14.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE14.11.2014
LU14.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU14.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU14.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU14.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU14.11.2014
Former [2015/08]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT12.03.2014
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
Former [2014/41]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US6559435  (SCHOFIELD KENNETH [US] ET AL) [X] 1-17,22-26 * abstract *;
 [X]US2004201483  (STAM JOSEPH S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4-7,10-12,18-21 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2004201483  (STAM JOSEPH S [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005060069  (BREED DAVID S [US], et al)
by applicantUS5837994
 US5990469
 US6008486
 US6130448
 US6130421
 US6049171
 US6465963
 US6403942
 US6587573
 US6611610
 US6621616
 US6631316
 US6774988
 US6861809
 US2004143380
 US2004008410
 US2004120358
 US2004201483
 US2006016965
 US6923027
 US6617566
 US6681163
 US2004232773