Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1814480

EP1814480 - NOVEL ENHANCED COATING FOR PROSTHETIC LINERS PROCESSES, PRODUCTS AND IMPROVED UMBRELLAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 22.07.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Change: Date of oral proceedings 
24.04.2015Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
24.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freedom Innovations, LLC
7 Studebaker Road
Irvine CA 92618-2012 / US
[2009/36]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
Freedom Innovations, Inc.
7 Studebaker Road
Irvine CA 92618-2012 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHANNON, Donald T.
31881 Stoney Creek Road
Trabuco Canyon, California 92679 / US
[2007/32]
Representative(s)Crease, Devanand John
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]Crease, Devanand John
Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2007/32]Stephen, Robert John , et al
Olswang 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date05851833.318.11.2005
[2007/32]
WO2005US41890
Priority number, dateUS20040630108P22.11.2004         Original published format: US 630108 P
US20050662182P15.03.2005         Original published format: US 662182 P
US2005015602817.06.2005         Original published format: US 156028
[2007/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006057916
Date:01.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1814480
Date:08.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006
[2007/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1814480
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US01.06.2006
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/78, // B29C33/40, B28B1/00
[2008/04]
Former International [2007/32]A61B18/04, A61B18/18, B29C33/40, B28B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE VERBESSERTE BESCHICHTUNG FÜR PROTHETISCHE EINSATZPROZESSE, PRODUKTE UND VERBESSERTE SCHIRME[2007/32]
English:NOVEL ENHANCED COATING FOR PROSTHETIC LINERS PROCESSES, PRODUCTS AND IMPROVED UMBRELLAS[2007/32]
French:REVETEMENT AMELIORE POUR CHEMISAGE DE PROTHESES, PRODUITS ET PARAPLUIES AMELIORES[2007/32]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2006National basic fee paid 
03.10.2006Search fee paid 
03.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/32]
31.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2009Fee for grant paid
21.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2010  10.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Otto Bock HealthCare GmbH
Max-Näder-Str. 15
37115 Duderstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Lins, Edgar
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/27]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2010   
Otto Bock HealthCare GmbH
Max-Näder-Str. 15
37115 Duderstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Lins, Edgar
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
09.07.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0373/12
20.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2014Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
12.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
29.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
TR02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
LU18.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB02.12.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
[2015/22]
Former [2011/32]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
LU18.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB02.12.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
Former [2011/22]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
LU18.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB02.12.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2011/16]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB02.12.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2011/05]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB02.12.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2011/02]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE18.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/40]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/28]BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/24]CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/20]CY02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
Former [2010/19]CY02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
Former [2010/16]CY02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Former [2010/13]FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0167842
 [Y]WO03051241
International search[X]US6231617
 [Y]US5746772
 [Y]US6454812
 [Y]US4908037
 [A]US5830237