EP1815141 - VENTURI FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patterson Fan Company 1120 Northpoint Boulevard Blythewood, SC 29016 / US | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Mark 6036 Northridge Road Columbia, South Carolina 29206 / US | 02 /
PATTERSON, Vance, M. 4950 Cantebury Place Morganton, North Carolina 28655 / US | 03 /
SALISBURY, Thomas 6347 Briarwood Road Columbia, South Carolina 29206 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05852085.9 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US42508 | Priority number, date | US20040630113P | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 630113 P | US20050237299 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: US 237299 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006058100 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815141 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D11/00, F03B1/00, F03B11/02 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
F04D29/545 (EP,US);
F04D29/661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTURIKÜHLER | [2007/32] | English: | VENTURI FAN | [2007/32] | French: | VENTILATEUR VENTURI | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 16.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US442615 ; | [A]US2252256 (HUNTINGTON HARRIS ELIOT); | [A]USD444222S (WILSON JR RODNEY [US]) |