Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1827362

EP1827362 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITION AND APPEARANCE OF SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/36]COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF THEIR USE FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITION AND APPEARANCE OF SKIN
[2017/10]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2018 [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avon Products, Inc.
777 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2013/11]
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
AVON PRODUCTS, INC.
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DRYER, Laurence
137 Barrister Drive
Butler, NJ 07405 / US
02 / PTCHELINTSEV, Dmitri
1 Second Street 1408
Jersey City, NJ 07302 / US
 [2007/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/36]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date05852369.728.11.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005US43066
Priority number, dateUS2004002107322.12.2004         Original published format: US 21073
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006068786
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1827362
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.04.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/97, A61Q19/08
[2017/11]
Former International [2007/36]A61K6/00, A61K8/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES ZUSTANDS UND DES AUSSEHENS DER HAUT[2017/10]
English:METHODS FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITION AND APPEARANCE OF SKIN[2017/10]
French:METHODES POUR AMELIORER L'ETAT ET L'ASPECT DE LA PEAU[2017/10]
Former [2007/36]ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES ZUSTANDS UND DES AUSSEHENS DER HAUT
Former [2007/36]COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF THEIR USE FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITION AND APPEARANCE OF SKIN
Former [2007/36]COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES UTILISANT CES COMPOSITIONS POUR AMELIORER L'ETAT ET L'ASPECT DE LA PEAU
Entry into regional phase28.06.2007National basic fee paid 
28.06.2007Search fee paid 
28.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
22.10.2010Observations by third parties
25.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2014Observations by third parties
07.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/02]
23.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/02]
Divisional application(s)EP13181653.0  / EP2689767
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]IN185393  ;
 [XI]IN191797  ;
 [XI]US5466455  (HUFFSTUTLER JR MILES C [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * claims 1, 10 * * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 8 * [I] 1-23
 [XP]  - AK DAS & HUI TAG, "Ethnomedicinal studies of the Khamti tribe of Arunachal Pradesh", INDIAN JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20060701), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0972-5938, pages 317 - 322, XP018021425 [XP] 1-11 * page 3 *
 [XPI]  - SOUMIT K BEHERA ET AL, "Medicinal plants used by the Kandhas of Kandhamal district of Orissa", INDIAN JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20061001), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 0972-5938, pages 519 - 528, XP018021463 [XP] 1-23 * paragraph plumbago indica - page 7 * [I] 1-23
 [X]  - 0, vol. 2010, no. 17, Database accession no. 2010-C07940, XP002679574 [X] 1-11 * abstract *
 [XPI]  - KINGSTON 1 C ET AL, "Indigenous knowledge of using medicinal plants in treating skin diseases in Kanyakumari district, Southern India", INDIAN JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20090401), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 0972-5938, pages 196 - 200, XP018027509 [XP] 1-23 * pages 1-2, paragraph methodology * * page 2, line 20 - line 22 * [I] 1-23
 [XI]  - Anonymous, "Plumbago indica", internet Article, (2001), pages 1 - 4, Indiamart, URL: http://trade.indiamart.com/details.mp?offer=2338813134, (20120709), XP002679575 [X] 1-23 * page 1 * [I] 1-23
 [X]  - SOLOMON F E ET AL, "Toxic effects of crude root extract of Plumbago rosea (Rakta chitraka) on mice and rats", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-8741(93)90081-F, ISSN 0378-8741, (19930101), pages 79 - 84, (19930101), XP023827228 [X] 1-11 * page 80, column LHC, line 7q - line 15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-8741(93)90081-F
 [XI]  - 0, vol. 2009, no. 72, Database accession no. 2009-P65045, XP002679576 [X] 1-11 * abstract * [I] 1-11
International search[X]US2003175366  (PAULY GILLES [FR], et al);
 [X]US2003108628  (BABISH JOHN G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5997889  (DURR NORMA JEAN HOLLOWAY [US], et al)
by applicantWO0166067
 US5146846
 US5223262
 US4820724
 US4379454
 US4956171
 US5770222
 US5847003
 US5834513
    - C. KINGSTON ET AL., INDIAN J. OF TRADIONAL KNOWLEDGE, (2009), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 196 - 200,
    - F.E. SOLOMON ET AL., J. OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1993), vol. 38, pages 79 - 84,
    - M.A.H. MOLLIK ET AL., EUROPEAN J. OF INTEGRATIVE MEDICINE, (2009), pages 191 - 192,
    - S. HOSSAN ET AL., ETHNOBOTANY RESEARCH & APPLICATIONS, (2010), vol. 8, pages 61 - 74,
    - BHELA SAMHITA, English translation, commentary, (2000), pages 337 - 338,
    - REDDY ET AL., "Expression of Frizzled Genes in Developing and Postnatal Hair Follicles", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 123, no. 2, pages 275 - 282,
    - PULKKINEN L ET AL., "Mutation analysis and molecular genetics of epidermolysis bullosa", MATRIX BIOL, (1999), vol. 18, pages 29 - 42,
    - KATZENELLENBOGEN,B.S., "Estrogen receptors: bioactivities and interactions with cell' signaling pathways", BIOL. REPROD., (1996), vol. 54, pages 287 - 293,
    - KATZENELLENBOGEN, B.S. ET AL., "Antiestrogens: mechanisms of action and resistance in breast cancer", BREAST CANCER RES. TREAT., (1997), vol. 44, pages 23 - 38,
    - J. SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1989),
    - R. HIGUCHI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 413 - 417,
    - R. HIGUCHI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1026 - 1030,
    - "Amplification of RNA", E.S. KAWASAKI ET AL., RNA Protocols: A Guide to Methods & Applications, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), pages 21 - 27,
    - V.E. VELCULESCU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, no. 5235, pages 484 - 487,
    - A. LAL ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 21, pages 5403 - 5407,
    - J. O'CONNELL, RT-PCR Protocols, HUMANA PRESS, (2002),
    - R. RAPLEY; D.L. MANNING, RNA Isolation and Characterization Protocols, HUMANA PRESS, (1998),
    - R. RAPLEY, Nucleic Acid Protocols Handbook, HUMANA PRESS, (2000),
    - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary (ICID) and Handbook, COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION, (2004), pages 2177 - 2299,
    - ICID, pages 2276 - 2285,
    - ICID, pages 2293 - 2299,
other   - "PARPATIGUAH", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4133, XP003033297
    - BRHAT NIGHANTU RATNAKARA, (1997), vol. 4, page 70,
    - "RAKTA CITRAKA EVAM KRSNA CITRAKA PRAYOGA", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG5/289A, XP003033298
    - RASARNAVAMA, (2001), vol. 4, page 189,
    - "THAAMARAI THYLAM", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. ME02/138, XP003033299
    - PULIPPANI, PULIPPANI VAITHYAM, (1999), vol. 1, pages 104 - 105,
    - "TILA BARA-E-TAHABBUJ-A", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/2245, XP003033300
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, IIAAJ-AL-AMRAAZ, (1921), page 192,
    - "KUSHTAHARA LEPA-02", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG7/175B, XP003033501
    - BHELA, BHELA SAMHITA, (2000), vol. 1, pages 337 - 338,
    - "AUSADHA SNANAM", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SL1/559, XP003033502
    - ACHARYA GUIRAJ SHARMA MISHRA, SIDDAPRAYOGALATIKA, (2005), vol. 2, page 204,
    - "MADANANAMODAKAH", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS/184, XP003033503
    - BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA, (1999), vol. 2, page 39,