Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1836298

EP1836298 - COMPOSITIONS OF AMINOACYL-tRNA SYNTHETASE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2012
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMBRX, INC.
10975 North Torrey Pines Road, Suite 100
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2007/39]
Inventor(s)01 / PAULSEL, Andrew
16549 38th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
02 / CHO, Ho Sung
5225 Fiore Terrace, Apt. 107
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
 [2011/29]
Former [2008/12]01 / PAULSEL, Andrew
6549 38th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
02 / CHO, Ho Sung
5225 Fiore Terrace, Apt. 107
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
Former [2007/39]01 / PAULSEL, Andrew
16549 38th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
02 / CHO, Ho Sung
5225 Fiore Terrace, Apt. 107
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/39]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date05852740.901.12.2005
[2007/39]
WO2005US43603
Priority number, dateUS20040639146P22.12.2004         Original published format: US 639146 P
[2007/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006068802
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1836298
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1836298
Date:18.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/52, C12N9/00, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/63, C12P21/02
[2008/27]
Former International [2007/39]C12N9/22, C12P21/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/39]
Extension statesAL13.07.2007
BA13.07.2007
HR13.07.2007
MK13.07.2007
YU13.07.2007
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON AMINOACYL-TRNA-SYNTHETASE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2007/39]
English:COMPOSITIONS OF AMINOACYL-tRNA SYNTHETASE AND USES THEREOF[2007/39]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE SYNTHETASE D'AMINOACYL-ARNT ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES[2007/39]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2007National basic fee paid 
13.07.2007Search fee paid 
13.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
15.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2011Fee for grant paid
09.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2008
Opposition(s)19.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2005
AT18.01.2012
CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
TR18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]AT18.01.2012
CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
TR18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/22]AT18.01.2012
CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/07]AT18.01.2012
CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/50]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/49]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/48]CY18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/39]FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/37]FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/36]LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/35]LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/34]LT18.01.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/33]LT18.01.2012
Documents cited:SearchWO02085923  [ ] (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]; SCHULTZ PETER [US]; WANG LEI [US]; ANDERSO) [ ] * example 7 *;
 WO2004035605  [ ] (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]; SCHULTZ PETER G [US]; WANG LEI [US]; ZHANG) [ ] * paragraph [0137] *;
 [X]  - "Mutant synthetase to incorporate m-acyl phe into protein (ketone 3-4).", Geneseq, (20031106), Database accession no. ABJ72209, URL: EBI, XP002481795 [X] 1-3,5-10,12-31,35,36 * abstract *
 [X]  - "O-RS LW5RS.", Geneseq, (20040715), Database accession no. ADO08138, URL: EBI, XP002481796 [X] 1-3,5-10,12-31,35,36 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATTA DEEPSHIKHA ET AL, "A designed phenylalanyl-tRNA synthetase variant allows efficient in vivo incorporation of aryl ketone functionality into proteins.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 22 MAY 2002, (20020522), vol. 124, no. 20, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5652 - 5653, XP002337184 [X] 4,11,32-34 * page 5652 - page 5653 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0177096
International search[X]US6927042  (SCHULTZ PETER G [US], et al);
 [X]WO02086075  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al);
 [X]US2003108885  (SCHULTZ PETER [US], et al);
 [X]US2003082575  (SCHULTZ PETER [US], et al);
 [X]  - WANG L. ET AL., "Addition of the keto functional group to the genetic code of Escherichia coli", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI: USA, (20030107), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 56 - 61, XP003019022

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0234824100
by applicantEP0284044
 EP0329203
 EP0073657
 WO02085923
    - CHEMBIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1135 - 1137
    - L. WANG; P. G. SCHULTZ, CHEM. COMM., (2002), vol. 1, pages 1 - 11
    - LIU, D. R.; SCHULTZ, P. G., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1999), vol. 96, pages 4780 - 4785
    - PASTMAK, M ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (2000), vol. 83, pages 2277 - 2286
    - OHNO, S. ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 124, pages 1065 - 1068
    - KOWAL, A. K. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2001), vol. 98, pages 2268 - 2273
    - EDWARDS, H.; SCHIMMEL, P., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 1633 - 1641
    - SAKAMOTO, K. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, pages 4692 - 4699
    - "Programming peptidomimetic synthetases by translating genetic codes designed de novo", PNAS, vol. 100, no. 11, pages 6353 - 6357
    - FENG ET AL., "Expanding tRNA recognition of a tRNA synthetase by a single amino acid change", PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 10, pages 5676 - 5681
    - CECH, SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 236, pages 1532 - 1539
    - MCCORKLE ET AL., CONCEPTS BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 64, pages 221 - 226
    - TLLANGAKEKARE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 643 - 647
    - LOHSE ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 381, pages 442 - 444
    - HECHT, S. M., ACC. CHEM. RES., (1992), vol. 25, page 545
    - HECKLER, T. G. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 27, page 7254
    - HECHT, S. M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1978), vol. 253, page 4517
    - CORNISH, V. W.; MENDEL, D.; SCHULTZ, P. G., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1995), vol. 34, page 621
    - ROBERTSON, S. A.; ELLMAN, J. A.; SCHULTZ, P. G., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 113, page 2722
    - NOREN, C. J. ET AL., PROTEIN GENE
    - SAYERS, J.R.; SCHMIDT, W. ECKSTEIN, F., "Exonucleases in phosphorothioate-based olignoucleotide-directed mutagensis", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1988), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 791 - 802
    - KOBAYASHI ET AL., NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 425 - 432
    - ELLMAN, J.A.; MENDEL, D.; SCHULTZ, P.G., "Site-specific incorporation of novel backbone structures into proteins", SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, no. 5041, pages 197 - 200
    - FRANCISCO, J. A. ET AL., "Production and fluorescence-activated cell sorting of Escherichia coli expressing a functional antibody fragment on the external surface", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10444 - 8
    - MIYANOHARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 1
    - HITZEMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 12073
    - HOLLAND ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 17, page 4900
    - HESS ET AL., J. ADV. ENZYME REG., (1969), vol. 7, page 149
    - MILLER, ANN. REV. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 42, page 177
    - LUCKOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY
    - RAIBAUD ET AL., ANNU. REV. GENET., (1984), vol. 18, page 173
    - "Laboratory Techniques in Biochemistry and Molecular Biology-Hybridization with Nucleic Acid Probes", TIJSSEN, Overview of principles of hybridization and the strategy of nucleic acid probe assays, ELSEVIER, (1993), vol. I
    - HAMES; HIGGINS, Gene Probes, IRL PRESS AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), page 1
    - BERGER; KIMMEL, Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 152
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning - A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1989), vol. 1-3
    - N. BUDISA ET AL., FASEB J., (1999), vol. 13, page 41
    - M. IBBA; P. KAST; H. HENNECKE, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, page 7107
    - M. IBBA; H. HENNECKE, FEBS LETT., (1995), vol. 364, page 272