Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1827459

EP1827459 - THERAPEUTIC ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2855 Gazelle Court
Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US
[2016/07]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2855 Gazelle Court
Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1896 Rutherford Road
Carlsbad CA 92008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEDEL, Mark, K.
46420 Volvare Rd.
Temecula, California 92590 / US
 [2007/36]
Representative(s)Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2011/10](deleted)
...
Former [2009/51]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2008/20]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/36]Forrest, Graham Robert , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date05852746.602.12.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005US43611
Priority number, dateUS20040632826P02.12.2004         Original published format: US 632826 P
US20050716355P12.09.2005         Original published format: US 716355 P
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006060649
Date:08.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1827459
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.10.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N5/00
[2007/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE ANTISENSE-OLIGONUCLEOTID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHER DARMERKRANKUNG[2007/36]
English:THERAPEUTIC ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE[2007/36]
French:COMPOSITION THERAPEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ANTISENS DESTINEE AU TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS INTESTINALES INFLAMMATOIRES[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2007National basic fee paid 
25.06.2007Search fee paid 
25.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
30.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination22.07.2015Appeal received No.  T2274/15
09.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.01.2011Request for further processing filed
24.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
02.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
15.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003040497  (TENG CHING-LEOU [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * See claims 1, 2, 3, 12, 16, 18, 26: rectal administration of ISIS 2032 for the treament of inflammatory bowel disorders, ulcerative cholitis in particular * * See paragraphs 53 and 54: ISIS 2302 for the treatment of chrohn's disease and ulcerative cholitis * * See table 19 and formulation 12b: compositions for rectal use comprising ISIS 2302 and hydroxypropylcellulose *;
 [X]US2004162259  (WEDEL MARK K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * See claim 1 and 6 and see examples 8, 9: method of treating pouchitis (a complication of ulcerative cholitis) comprising rectal administration of ICAM 2302 (Seq ID N.2) * * See enema formulations of example 17 (for rectal administration) , comprising ISIS 2302 and hydroxypropylcellulose and see administration to patients affected by pouchitis * * See page 2, paragraph [0011]: the method of the invention can be used to treat ulcerative cholitis and Chrohn's disease * * See paragraph [0055]: ISIS 2302 * * See table 22: Pouchitis Disease Activity Index and see "Usual stool frequency", "Rectal bleeding", and "Ulceration" *;
 [X]  - MINER JR P ET AL, "An Enema Formulation of Alicaforsen, an Antisense Inhibitor of Intercellular Adhesion Molecule-1, In the Treatment of Chronic, Unremitting Pouchitis", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS LTD., CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20040101), vol. 19, ISSN 0269-2813, pages 281 - 286, XP002990394 [X] 1-15 * See abstract, Table 1 and study drug: enema formulation comprising ISIS 2302 and hydroxypropylcellulose for the treatment of chronic unremitting pouchitis *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2036.2004.01863.x
 [Y]  - YU ROSIE Z ET AL, "Prediction of clinical responses in a simulated phase III trial of Crohn's patients administered the antisense phosphorothioate oligonucleotide ISIS 2302: comparison of proposed dosing regimens.", ANTISENSE & NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOPMENT FEB 2003, (200302), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 1087-2906, pages 57 - 66, XP002552080 [Y] 1-15 * See abstract, results and conclusion: ISIS 2302, 250-4000 mg/day provides high rate of clinical response in clinical treatment of Crohn' s disease *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/108729003764097340
 [Y]  - YACYSHYN B R ET AL, "Dose ranging pharmacokinetic trial of high-dose alicaforsen (intercellular adhesion molecule-1 antisense oligodeoxynucleotide) (ISIS 2302) in active Crohn's disease.", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS OCT 2002, (200210), vol. 16, no. 10, ISSN 0269-2813, pages 1761 - 1770, XP002552081 [Y] 1-15 * See summary, results and discussion: infusion of ISIS 2302, 300-350 mg/day achieves desired drug response in patients affected by Crohn's disease *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2036.2002.01341.x
 [Y]  - VAN ASSCHE GERT ET AL, "Antiadhesion molecule therapy in inflammatory bowel disease.", INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 1078-0998, pages 291 - 300, XP002552082 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00054725-200207000-00009
International search[YP]US6930093  ;
 [Y]US6747014  ;
 [Y]US6096722  ;
 [Y]  - MINER P. ET AL, "An Enema Formulation of Alicaforsen, An Antisense Inhibitor of Intercellular Adhesion Molecule-1, In the Treatment of Chronic, Unremitting Pouchitis", ALIMENT. PHARMACOL. THER., (200402), vol. 19, pages 281 - 286, XP002990394

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2036.2004.01863.x