Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1831303

EP1831303 - RHEOLOGY MODIFIED POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[2010/13]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
For all designated states
Michie, William J. Jr.
9111 South Fitzgerald Way
Missouri City TX 77459 / US
For all designated states
Hogan, Todd A.
1969 North Green Meadow Street
Sanford MI 48657 / US
For all designated states
Martinez, Felipe F.
3206 Lobolly Pines Way
Houston TX 77082 / US
For all designated states
Neubauer, Anthony C.
5 Gilman Drive
Piscataway NJ 08854 / US
For all designated states
Costeux, Stéphane
400 Timbercreek Drive Apt. 916
Richwood TX 77541 / US
For all designated states
Chang, Dane
4911 Chritien Point Court
Sugar Land TX 77478 / US
For all designated states
Kapur, Mridula
235 Dewberry Drive
Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US
Former [2007/37]For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies Inc.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
For all designated states
Michie, William J. Jr.
9111 South Fitzgerald Way
Missouri City TX 77459 / US
For all designated states
Hogan, Todd A.
1969 North Green Meadow Street
Sanford MI 48657 / US
For all designated states
Martinez, Felipe F.
3206 Lobolly Pines Way
Houston TX 77082 / US
For all designated states
Neubauer, Anthony C.
5 Gilman Drive
Piscataway NJ 08854 / US
For all designated states
Costeux, Stéphane
400 Timbercreek Drive Apt. 916
Richwood TX 77541 / US
For all designated states
Chang, Dane
4911 Chritien Point Court
Sugar Land TX 77478 / US
For all designated states
Kapur, Mridula
235 Dewberry Drive
Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Michie, William J.
9111 South Fitzgerald Way
Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US
02 / Hogan, Todd A.
1969 North Green Meadow Street
Sanford MI 48657 / US
03 / Martinez, Felipe F.
3206 Lobolly Pines Way
Houston Texas 77082 / US
04 / Neubauer, Anthony C.
5 Gilman Drive
Piscataway NJ 08854 / US
05 / Costeux, Stéphane
400 Timbercreek Drive, Apartment 916
Richwood Texas 77541 / US
06 / Chang, Dane
4911 Chritien Point Court
Sugar Land Texas 77478 / US
07 / Kapur, Mridula
235 Dewberry Drive
Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US
 [2010/13]
Former [2007/37]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/37]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05853539.409.12.2005
[2007/37]
WO2005US44643
Priority number, dateUS20040637105P17.12.2004         Original published format: US 637105 P
[2007/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006065651
Date:22.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1831303
Date:12.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006
[2007/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1831303
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/04, C08K5/43
[2007/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RHEOLOGIEMODIFIZIERTE POLYETHYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2007/37]
English:RHEOLOGY MODIFIED POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITIONS[2007/37]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLYETHYLENE A RHEOLOGIE MODIFIEE[2007/37]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2007National basic fee paid 
17.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
21.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2009Fee for grant paid
16.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09014138.3  / EP2218751
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.10.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
TR14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
BG14.07.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
IE09.12.2010
LU09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/47]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
TR14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
IE09.12.2010
LU09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/44]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
IE09.12.2010
LU09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/42]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
IE09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/41]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
IE09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/47]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
IE09.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/36]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/16]AT14.04.2010
BE14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/12]AT14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/08]AT14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/03]AT14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
CY19.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
Former [2011/02]AT14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL14.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US6143829  (BABB DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * column 23, lines 1-41; examples 4,5; table 3 *;
 [X]US6395791  (CHAUDHARY BHARAT I [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * claims 37,38 *