Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819399

EP1819399 - ORAL APPLIANCE WITH HEAT TRANSFER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.
82 Cambridge Street
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
[2007/34]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTSHULER, Gregory, B.
17 Cerulean Way
Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US
02 / EROFEEV, Andrei V.
61 Wesley Street
North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US
03 / BELIKOV, Andre, Viacheslavovitch
141/86 Narodnogo Opolcheniya Avenue
St.Petersburg, 198217 / RU
 [2007/47]
Former [2007/34]01 / ALTSHULER, Gregory, B.
17 Cerulean Way
Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US
02 / EROFEEV, Andrei V.
38 Royal Crest Drive, Suite 7
North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US
03 / BELIKOV, Andre, Viacheslavovitch
141/86 Narodnogo Opolcheniya Avenue
St.Petersburg, 198217 / RU
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/34]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date05853675.609.12.2005
[2007/34]
WO2005US44808
Priority number, dateUS20040634643P09.12.2004         Original published format: US 634643 P
[2007/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006063318
Date:15.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1819399
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ORALE ANWENDUNG MIT WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSMECHANISMUS[2007/34]
English:ORAL APPLIANCE WITH HEAT TRANSFER MECHANISM[2007/34]
French:APPAREIL BUCCAL AVEC MECANISME DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR[2007/34]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2007National basic fee paid 
25.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
09.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/51]
06.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200703   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2008
31.12.200905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2004084752  (PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC; ALTSHULER, GREGORY, B; TUCHIN, VALE) [Y] 1-20 * page 11, line 29 - page 13, line 26; claims 18,19,36-39,78-82,121-125,160-164,200-204 *;
 [Y]US2004133251  (ALTSHULER GREGORY B ET AL) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0010] , [0119] , [0144] *;
 [A]US2003009205  (BIEL MERRILL A) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0047] *;
 [A]US6290713  (RUSSELL THOMAS A) [A] 1,15 * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 5 * * column 11, line 57 - line 64 *;
 [A]US5728090  (MARTIN ET AL) [A] 1,15 * column 4, line 50 - line 57 *;
 [A]GB2239675  (MAN FAI * SHIU) [A] 12 * the whole document *