Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1824669

EP1824669 - ARTICLES HAVING IMPROVED CLARITY, PREPARED FROM PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.05.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2013/27]
Former [2007/35]For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
P.O. Box 674412 Houston
Texas 77267-4412 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURMASTER, Douglas
9010 McAvoy
Houston, Texas 77074 / US
02 / HODGES, Owen
6126 Queenswood Lane
Houston, Texas 77008 / US
03 / LUMUS, J., Lane
3833 Hansen Drive
Dickinson, Texas 77539 / US
04 / KELLY, Lu, Ann
16018 Leigh Canyon Drive
Friendswood, Texas 77546 / US
05 / MURPHY, Mark
11832 Cedar Gully
Beach City, Texas 77520 / US
 [2007/35]
Representative(s)Raboin, Jean-Christophe , et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Leyder, Francis
Total Reseach & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Former [2007/35]Leyder, Francis
Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Application number, filing date05853858.812.12.2005
[2007/35]
WO2005US45032
Priority number, dateUS2004001249915.12.2004         Original published format: US 12499
[2007/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006065799
Date:22.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1824669
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006
[2007/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1824669
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/06, C08F210/16
[2013/04]
Former International [2007/35]B32B1/02, B32B1/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/35]
TitleGerman:AUS PROPYLEN-ETHYLEN-COPOLYMEREN HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTER KLARHEIT[2007/35]
English:ARTICLES HAVING IMPROVED CLARITY, PREPARED FROM PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS[2007/35]
French:ARTICLES PRESENTANT UNE TRANSPARENCE AMELIOREE PREPARES A PARTIR DE COPOLYMERES PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE[2007/35]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2007National basic fee paid 
15.06.2007Search fee paid 
15.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/35]
28.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2013Fee for grant paid
26.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Haggenmüller, Christian, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Haggenmüller, Christian, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
11.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition19.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1627/17
09.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2005
AT04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2014/48]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/23]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/22]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY24.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT04.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004033509  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10 * example 7b *
International search[X]US6585819  (ZHAO XIAODONG EDWARD [US]);
 [A]US6576710  (HUOVINEN PAEIVI [IT], et al)