Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838854

EP1838854 - Antibodies that recognize Beta Amyloid Peptide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/40]HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES THAT RECOGNIZE BETA AMYLOID PEPTIDE
[2012/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy
2nd Floor, Treasury Building
Lower Grand Canal Street
Dublin 2 / IE
For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
[2012/43]
Former [2010/19]For all designated states
Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy
Little Island Industrial Estate
Little Island, County Cork / IE
For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
Former [2010/17]For all designated states
Elan Pharma International Limited
Monksland Athlone
County Westmeath / IE
For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
Former [2010/16]For all designated states
Neuralab, Ltd.
102 St. James Court Flatts
Smiths, FL04 / BM
For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Neuralab, Ltd.
102 St. James Court Flatts
Smiths, FL04 / BM
For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison NJ 07940 / US
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Neuralab, Ltd.
102 St. James Court Flatts
Smiths, FL04 / BM
For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BASI, Guriq
514 Rhodes Drive
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Jack, Steven
229 Mulberry Road
Ramsey, New Jersey 07446 / US
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/40]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date05854278.815.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005US45515
Priority number, dateUS20040636684P15.12.2004         Original published format: US 636684 P
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006066049
Date:22.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1838854
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838854
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61P25/28
[2012/17]
Former International [2007/40]C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/83, C12N5/00, C12N5/10, A01K67/027, A61K48/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61P25/28, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N33/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesAL16.07.2007
BA16.07.2007
HR16.07.2007
MK16.07.2007
YU16.07.2007
TitleGerman:Antikörper, die Amyloid-Peptide erkennen[2012/21]
English:Antibodies that recognize Beta Amyloid Peptide[2012/17]
French:Anticorps reconnaissant le peptide beta amyloide[2012/17]
Former [2007/40]HUMANISIERTE ANTIKÖRPER, DIE BETA AMYLOID-PEPTID ERKENNEN
Former [2007/40]HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES THAT RECOGNIZE BETA AMYLOID PEPTIDE
Former [2007/40]ANTICORPS HUMANISES RECONNAISSANT LE PEPTIDE BETA AMYLOIDE
Entry into regional phase16.07.2007National basic fee paid 
16.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
18.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2012Fee for grant paid
12.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2007
Opposition(s)01.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.10.2008Request for further processing filed
23.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.11.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.12.2005
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
LU15.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
LU15.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2014/21]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/33]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
Former [2013/20]LT31.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0246237  (NEURALAB LTD, et al) [X] 43-48,55-62,67,70-74,77,93-95 * sequences 13,14 * * claims 60,61,134-136,152-154 * * example 10 *;
 [X]WO2004071408  (APPLIED MOLECULAR EVOLUTION [US], et al) [X] 49 * sequence 1 *;
 [X]WO2004044204  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [X] 51 * sequence 26 *;
 [XY]WO0162801  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [X] 41,42,49,51,67,68,72,73,75,76,78,84-87 * examples 11-15 * * figures 4,5 * * sequences 9-12 * [Y] 1-40,43,44,48,63-66,69-71,74;
 [X]WO03072036  (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [X] 42 * figure 22 *;
 [X]US6727349  (LAROSA GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 101-107 * sequence 27 *;
 [XY]WO03077858  (NEURALAB LTD, et al) [X] 79,81,82 * claims 73-75 * [Y] 80;
 [X]WO03015691  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [X] 88-92,97-99 * example 1 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP1481992  (UNIV ST LOUIS [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0071] *;
 [PX]WO2005026211  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-5 * sequence 30 *
 [X]  - ACC.NO.: P18525, "HV54_MOUSE", DATABASE UniProt, XP002388370 [X] 55-62 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - KLYUBIN I ET AL, "P2-004 Anti-Abeta antibodies prevention block of long-term potentiation in the CA1 area of rat hippocampus in vivo by naturally produced Abeta oligomers", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (200407), vol. 25, ISSN 0197-4580, pages S224 - S225, XP004625366 [Y] 1-40,43,44,48,63-66,69-71,74,80 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0197-4580(04)80752-8
ExaminationWO03016467
 WO2006066171
by applicantWO03016467
 WO9222653
 US4704362
    - GOATE ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, page 704,
    - CHARTIER HARLAN ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 353, page 8,
    - MURRELL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, page 97,
    - MULLAN ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1992), vol. 1, page 345,
    - HARDY, TINS, (1997), vol. 20, page 154,
    - JOHNSON-WOOD ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 1550,
    - SCHENK ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 400, page 173,
    - BARD ET AL., NAT. MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 916 - 19,
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92,
    - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34,
    - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41,
    - KETTLEBOROUGH ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 4, page 773,
    - KOLBINGER ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1993), vol. 6, page 971,
    - KABAT ET AL., Sequence of Proteins of Immunological Interest, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH HUMAN SERVICES PUBLICATION,
    - Scopes, Protein Purification, SPRINGER-VERLAG,
    - CHARTIER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 353, page 844,
    - MULLAN ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1992), vol. 1, pages 345 - 7,
    - KOWALSKA ET AL., POLISH J. PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 56, pages 171 - 8,
    - Remington'8 Pharmaceutical Science, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY,