Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1827583

EP1827583 - IMPLANTABLE HERMETICALLY SEALED STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Proteus Digital Health, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Proteus Digital Health, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City CA 94065 / US
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
Proteus Biomedical, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Costello, Benedict, J.
1316 Josephine Street
Berkeley, California 94730 / US
02 / Jensen, Marc
104 Strathmore Place
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
03 / * * *
04 / * * *
05 / Gelfandbein, Vladimir
707 Continental
Apt. 323
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
 [2012/47]
Former [2012/36]01 / Costello, Benedict, J.
1316 Josephine Street
Berkeley, California 94730 / US
02 / Jensen, Marc
104 Strathmore Place
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
03 / Zdeblick, Mark
300 La Mesa Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
04 / Frank, Jeremy
Redwood City, California / US
05 / Gelfandbein, Vladimir
707 Continental
Apt. 323
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
Former [2009/16]01 / Costello, Benedict, J.
1316 Josephine Street
Berkeley, California 94730 / US
02 / Gelfandbein, Vladimir
104 Strathmore Place
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
03 / Frank, Jeremy
300 La Mesa Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
04 / Zdeblick, Mark
1706 17th Avenue
San Francisco, California 94122 / US
05 / Jensen, Marc
707 Continental Apt. 323
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
Former [2007/36]01 / Costello, Benedict, J.
1316 Josephine Street
Berkeley, California 94730 / US
02 / Gelfandbein, Vladimier
104 Strathmore Place
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
03 / Frank, Jeremy
300 La Mesa Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
04 / Zdeblick, Mark
1706 17th Avenue
San Francisco, California 94122 / US
05 / Jensen, Marc
707 Continental Apt. 323
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
Representative(s)Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bavariaring 17
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Pettenkoferstrasse 37
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/36]Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date05855386.822.12.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005US46815
Priority number, dateUS20040638692P22.12.2004         Original published format: US 638692 P
US20050655609P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655609 P
US20050681919P16.05.2005         Original published format: US 681919 P
US20050697789P08.07.2005         Original published format: US 697789 P
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006069323
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1827583
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1827583
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.06.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61N1/375
[2012/34]
Former International [2007/36]A61N1/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARE, HERMETISCH ABGEDICHTETE STRUKTUREN[2007/36]
English:IMPLANTABLE HERMETICALLY SEALED STRUCTURES[2007/36]
French:STRUCTURES HERMETIQUEMENT SCELLEES IMPLANTABLES[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2007National basic fee paid 
03.07.2007Search fee paid 
03.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
22.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2012Fee for grant paid
15.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2010
Opposition(s)24.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2005
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
GR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
[2015/38]
Former [2015/34]HU22.12.2005
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/33]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2002165589  (IMRAN MIR A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,28-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0018] - [0020] - [0069] , [0108] * [Y] 13,15-18;
 [X]US3943936  (RASOR NED S, et al) [X] 1-12,14,28-34 * abstract *;
 [X]WO02089655  (INTRAPACE INC [US]) [X] 1-12,14,28-34 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5314458  (NAJAFI KHALIL [US], et al) [Y] 13,15-18 * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 11 - line 23 *;
 [A]WO9737720  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-18,28-34 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6051017  (LOEB GERALD E [CA], et al);
 [A]US5511533  (WALLER CHARLES O [US])
ExaminationEP0518364
 US4815469
 EP0314937