Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841924

EP1841924 - PROXIMITY FAUCET HAVING SELECTIVE AUTOMATIC AND MANUAL MODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ideal Standard International NV
Chaussée de Wavre 1789 bte 15
1160 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Ideal Standard International BVBA
Chaussée de Wavre 1789 bte 15
1160 Brussels / BE
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
American Standard International Inc.
1370 Avenue of the Americas 33rd Floor
New York, N.Y. 10019 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SEGGIO, Frank, A.
11 Kimberly Drive
Wayside, NJ 07712 / US
02 / MEISNER, David, J.
38 Monmouth Parkway
Monmouth Beach, NJ 07750 / US
03 / KASS, Robert, C.
2 Avalon Lakes Court
Skillman, NJ 08858 / US
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]Turner, James Arthur
D. Young & Co. 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date05855435.322.12.2005
[2007/41]
WO2005US46871
Priority number, dateUS20050644121P13.01.2005         Original published format: US 644121 P
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006076149
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1841924
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1841924
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:E03C1/05
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NÄHERUNGSARMATUR MIT WÄHLBARER AUTOMATISCHER UND MANUELLER BETRIEBSART[2007/41]
English:PROXIMITY FAUCET HAVING SELECTIVE AUTOMATIC AND MANUAL MODES[2007/41]
French:ROBINET DE PROXIMITE A MODES AUTOMATIQUE ET MANUEL SELECTIFS[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2007National basic fee paid 
08.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
28.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2008Fee for grant paid
01.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:21.07.2008
[2008/47]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/02]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/13]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/01]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4604764  (ENZO FAVA [IT]) [DA] 1,12 * column 2, line 30 - line 45; figure 1 *