Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844288

EP1844288 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH FLUID EXPANSION IN HEADER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
One Carrier Place
Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
One Carrier Place
Farmington, Connecticut 06034-4015 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GORBOUNOV, Mikhail B.
521 Deming Street
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
02 / LOZYNIAK, Steven A.
24 Northview Drive
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
03 / VERMA, Parmesh
39 Buckland Street, Apt 11132
Manchester, CT 06042 / US
04 / TARAS, Michael F.
5424 Springview Drive
Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US
05 / CHOPKO, Robert A.
25 Shriver Drive
Baldwinsville, NY 13027 / US
06 / KIRKWOOD, Allen C.
401 Fountain Drive
Brownsburg, IN 46122 / US
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Taylor, Adam David , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]Taylor, Adam David , et al
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/33]Booth, Catherine Louise
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2007/42]Booth, Catherine Louise
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date05855856.028.12.2005
[2007/42]
WO2005US47363
Priority number, dateUS20050649269P02.02.2005         Original published format: US 649269 P
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006083449
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1844288
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844288
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/02
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT FLUIDEXPANSION IN DER ENDKAMMER[2007/42]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER WITH FLUID EXPANSION IN HEADER[2007/42]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À DÉTENTE DU FLUIDE DANS LE COLLECTEUR[2007/42]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2007National basic fee paid 
04.07.2007Search fee paid 
04.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
24.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2011Fee for grant paid
01.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.05.2011
Opposition(s)20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200804   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
HU19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
LU28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
LU28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2013/29]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
LU28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2013/25]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
LU28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2013/07]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/49]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/47]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
IE28.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/37]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/36]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/34]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/33]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
IS19.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT19.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]DE7427716U  (WIELAND-WERKE) [X] 1-23 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2168135  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-23 * figure - *;
 [A]DE4439801  (GEA POWER COOLING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * figure - *
International search[X]US5320165  (HUGHES GREGORY G [US]);
 [Y]US2001004935  (SANADA RYOUICHI [JP], et al)