Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1834354

EP1834354 - MICROELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY WITH BUILT-IN THERMOELECTRIC COOLER AND METHOD OF FABRICATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/38]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FARAHANI, Mohammad
10006 Jupiter Hill Drive
Austin, TX 78747 / US
02 / CHRYSLER, Gregory
411 N Diane Court
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
03 / FRUTSCHY, Kris
2515 E. Rockledge Road
Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US
 [2007/38]
Representative(s)2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/38]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date05856066.527.12.2005
[2007/38]
WO2005US47594
Priority number, dateUS2004002435727.12.2004         Original published format: US 24357
[2007/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006072063
Date:06.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1834354
Date:19.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006
[2007/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/38, H01L35/28
[2007/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROELEKTRONISCHE BAUGRUPPE MIT EINGEBAUTER THERMOELEKTRISCHER KÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2007/38]
English:MICROELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY WITH BUILT-IN THERMOELECTRIC COOLER AND METHOD OF FABRICATING SAME[2007/38]
French:ASSEMBLAGE MICROELECTRONIQUE AVEC UN REFROIDISSEUR THERMOELECTRIQUE INTEGRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2007/38]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2007National basic fee paid 
19.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/38]
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.08.2015Appeal received No.  T0112/16
28.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
13.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6800933  (MATHEWS CHARLES R ET AL) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * figures 1,2,13-19 * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 10 * * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 22 * [A] 30;
 [XA]US6674128  (FISHER PHILIP A) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 4 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 7 * [A] 30;
 [XA]US6559538  (POMERENE ANDREW T. S ET AL) [X] 1-11,22-29 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 62 * * figures 2a-2g * [A] 12-21,30;
 [XA]US2002092307  (GHOSHAL UTTAM SHYAMALINDU) [X] 23,26,28,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] - [0042] - [0050] * * figures 3-5,8,9 * [A] 1-22,24,25,27,29;
 [XA]US6250085  (TOUSSON ELIAHOU) [X] 23,26,28,30 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 23 * [A] 1-22,24,25,27,29