Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839356

EP1839356 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FUEL CARTRIDGE DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.01.2012  [2012/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ultracell Corporation
399 Lindbergh Avenue
Livermore, CA 94551 / US
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KASCHMITTER, James, L.
6291 Alisal Street
Pleasanton, California 94566 / US
02 / KAYE, Ian, W.
1307 Chateau Common
Livermore, California 94550 / US
03 / RICHARDSON, Robert, David
1623 Harlan Drive
Danville, California 94526 / US
04 / DI SCIPIO, William
35733 Gissing Place
Fremont, California 94536 / US
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe
Hepworth Browne
15 St Paul's Street
Leeds LS1 2JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2007/40]Browne, Robin Forsythe
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB
Application number, filing date05857179.521.12.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005US46578
Priority number, dateUS20040638421P21.12.2004         Original published format: US 638421 P
US20050677424P02.05.2005         Original published format: US 677424 P
US20050682598P18.05.2005         Original published format: US 682598 P
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006069237
Date:29.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1839356
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:F17C13/02, F17C11/00, B67D5/24, G06F17/50, H01M8/04, G07F15/00, G07G1/14
[2009/22]
Former International [2007/40]H01M8/00, H01M8/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BRENNSTOFFKASSETTENVERTEILUNG[2007/40]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FUEL CARTRIDGE DISTRIBUTION[2007/40]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE CARTOUCHES DE COMBUSTIBLE[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2007National basic fee paid 
20.07.2007Search fee paid 
20.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
07.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/03]
31.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2003049996  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]US2003138679  (PRASED RAVI [US], et al)