Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2005115100

WO2005115100 - ROTOR AND EXCITER RING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2017New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Performance Friction Corporation
83 Carbon Metallic Highway
Clover, SC 29710 / US
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / YUHAS, David M.
14563 Heatherton Drive
Granger, IN 46530 / US
[N/P]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date05858797.302.05.2005
WO2005IB04218
Priority number, dateUS2004070969524.05.2004         Original published format: US 709695
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005115100
Date:08.12.2005
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005
[2005/49]
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT 
TitleGerman:ROTOR UND ERREGERRING
English:ROTOR AND EXCITER RING
Entry into regional phase27.12.2006National basic fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
04.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
11.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Appeal following examination17.10.2016Appeal received No.  J0019/16
16.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.08.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.08.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.12.200703   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.200804   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.200905   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201006   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201107   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201208   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201309   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201410   M06   Not yet paid
31.05.201612   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2016