Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1698326 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1698326



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1003
03.11.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
11.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.06.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.04.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.04.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.04.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.04.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
31.03.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
31.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
03.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 21
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
30.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
22.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.09.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.10.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.06.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
26.06.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
25.06.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.06.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
25.06.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
25.06.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
25.06.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 54
25.06.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.06.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
25.06.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
21.06.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
19.02.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.02.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.02.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 43
06.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.11.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.11.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 16
01.10.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
01.10.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.10.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
01.10.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
24.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
20.08.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.08.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.08.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
17.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
19.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
17.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
17.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
12.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.07.2012 Claims Opposition 4
12.07.2012 Claims Opposition 8
12.07.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.06.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.06.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.06.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2012 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
27.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
27.03.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
28.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
07.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.05.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.05.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 20
07.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
07.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
07.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
07.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
04.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
04.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
04.05.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 25
04.05.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
03.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.07.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.06.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 7
10.06.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
12.04.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.04.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.04.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
10.03.2008 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Annex Search / examination 4
21.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.02.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.02.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
17.12.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.08.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.2007 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
29.09.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.08.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.08.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 5
29.08.2006 European search report Search / examination 4
09.08.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.07.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
15.05.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.05.2006 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
10.01.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 7
10.01.2006 Description Search / examination 34
10.01.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
10.01.2006 Priority document Search / examination 46
10.01.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6