EP1681788 - Radio quality estimation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Hiroyuki c/oNTT DoCoMo, Inc. Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Usuda, Masafumi, c/oNTT DoCoMo, Inc., Int.Prop.Dept Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Takehiro c/oNTT DoCoMo, Inc., IPDept. Sanno Park T. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000741.6 | 13.01.2006 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | JP20050008456 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005008456 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1681788 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1681788 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
H04B17/309 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schätzung der Radioqualität | [2006/29] | English: | Radio quality estimation | [2006/29] | French: | Estimation de la qualité radio | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1460777 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0090] *; | [X]WO9949689 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 25 - line 36 * * page 5, line 19 - page 9, line 17 * * page 11, line 4 - line 10 * * page 17, line 6 - line 17 * |