Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1816265

EP1816265 - Sweeping machine for cleaning roads, streets or similar areas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Julius Tielbürger GmbH & Co. KG
Postdamm 12
32351 Stemwede-Oppenwehe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
Julius Tielbürger GmbH & Co. KG
Postdamm 12
D-32351 Stemwede-Oppenwehe / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tielbürger, Jörg
Sonnenbrink 6
32351 Stemwede-Oppenwehe / DE
 [2007/32]
Representative(s)Pott, Ulrich , et al
Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6
49084 Osnabrück / DE
[2012/50]
Former [2007/32]Pott, Ulrich , et al
Busse & Busse, Patentanwälte, Grosshandelsring 6
49084 Osnabrück / DE
Application number, filing date06002096.302.02.2006
[2007/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1816265
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1816265
Date:12.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:E01H1/04, E01H1/05
[2007/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
TitleGerman:Kehrmaschine zum Reinigen von Wegen, Straßen o. dgl. Nutzflächen[2007/32]
English:Sweeping machine for cleaning roads, streets or similar areas[2007/32]
French:Balayeuse pour nettoyer des voies, des routes ou surfaces utilisables similaires[2007/32]
Examination procedure14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
23.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2012Fee for grant paid
19.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.09.2013  17.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 [2018/34]
Former [2013/43]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2013  17.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.08.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition18.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2364/16
28.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
16.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
PL02.02.2018
ES03.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/35]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
PL02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2019/12]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2019/08]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/51]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/50]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT02.02.2018
CZ02.02.2018
FI02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
Former [2018/49]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
FI02.02.2018
HU03.02.2018
SE03.02.2018
Former [2018/47]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
FI02.02.2018
Former [2015/34]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
LU02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2014/07]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
IE02.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/42]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/40]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CY12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/34]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/26]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
GR13.03.2013
Former [2013/24]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
GR13.03.2013
Former [2013/23]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
Former [2013/20]LT12.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[DXAY]EP0199370  (STIGA AB [SE]) [DX] 1-3,5,9,10,12-14,16-18,21-26,28 * the whole document * [A] 15 [Y] 6,8,19;
 [YA]DE19506497  (MATTHIES HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 6,8,19 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,9,16,21-23,26,28;
 [DX]DE29920702U  (KERSTEN ECKHARD [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3,5,9,12-15,17-19,21-23,26,28 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19505156  (MATTHIES HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-4,11,16,21-23,26,28 * the whole document *