Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1708112

EP1708112 - DVD system for distributing protected content [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marvell World Trade Ltd.
Parker House
Wildey Business Park
Wildey Road
St. Michael / BB
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
Marvell World Trade Ltd.
Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road
St. Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / Sutardja, Sehat
27330 Elena Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
 [2006/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06002265.403.02.2006
[2006/40]
Priority number, dateUS2005008576121.03.2005         Original published format: US 85761
US2005017427601.07.2005         Original published format: US 174276
[2006/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1708112
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1708112
Date:21.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00
[2006/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/24]
Former [2006/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DVD-System zur Verteilung von geschütztem Inhalt[2010/01]
English:DVD system for distributing protected content[2006/40]
French:Système avec DVD pour distribuer un contenu protégé[2010/29]
Former [2006/40]DVD-Systeme zur Verteilung von geschützten Inhalt
Former [2006/40]Système avec DVD pour distribuer du contenu protégé
Examination procedure28.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
29.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.04.2010Fee for grant paid
21.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004213273  (MA KENNETH [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0060] *;
 [X]US2004117440  (SINGER MITCH FREDRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0211] *;
 [A]EP1439697  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [A] 3-6 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] *
by applicantUS2004213273
 US2004117440