Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1818505 Dossier alert: RSS

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 625
16.11.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.11.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.11.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
06.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.11.2017 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
06.11.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 2
04.09.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
04.09.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.09.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
07.08.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
31.07.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
28.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.07.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 12
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.07.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 36
18.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
19.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
13.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 4
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 4
10.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.03.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
27.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 20
14.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
19.12.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.04.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
16.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
11.02.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.05.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.05.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 4
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 4
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
16.05.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 4
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 4
16.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
16.05.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 14
20.03.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
20.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
20.03.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.03.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
20.03.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
13.02.2012 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
19.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 5
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2011 Claims Opposition 5
03.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
28.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
07.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.06.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.05.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.05.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Opposition 2
07.05.2009 General authorisation Opposition 2
07.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.07.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
06.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 4
15.02.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
20.08.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.07.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.07.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.07.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 1
03.07.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
08.02.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
08.02.2006 Description Search / examination 12
08.02.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2006 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.02.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6