Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1693499

EP1693499 - Swingably suspended inner assembly of a washing machine, method for controlling a washing machine and use of an electronic sensor as a movement sensor in an inner assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2012
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75
88239 Wangen / DE
[2006/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Weinmann, Martin
Burghaldenweg 4
88339 Bad Waldsee / DE
02 / Wauer, Roman-Hartmut
Flieder 3
88353 Kisslegg / DE
03 / Müller, Alexander
Eisenfurterstrasse 17
88339 Bad Waldsee-Reute / DE
 [2006/34]
Representative(s)Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
[2011/13]
Former [2006/34]Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date06002888.314.02.2006
[2006/34]
Priority number, dateDE2005100741318.02.2005         Original published format: DE102005007413
DE2005103714406.08.2005         Original published format: DE102005037144
[2006/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1693499
Date:23.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1693499
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1693499
Date:30.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/20
[2006/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/34]
TitleGerman:Schwingfähig aufgehängtes Innenaggregat einer Wäschebehandlungsmaschine, Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Wäschebehandlungsmaschine sowie Verwendung eines elektronischen Sensors als Schwingungssensor in einem Innenaggregat[2006/34]
English:Swingably suspended inner assembly of a washing machine, method for controlling a washing machine and use of an electronic sensor as a movement sensor in an inner assembly[2006/34]
French:Ensemble intérieur oscillant suspendu d'une machine à laver, procédé de commande d'une machine de traitement du linge, ainsi que l'utilisation d'un détecteur électronique comme détecteur d'oscillation de l'ensemble intérieur[2006/34]
Examination procedure17.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/18]
15.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2010Fee for grant paid
01.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.02.2006
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2013/29]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/10]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/08]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/02]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/47]CY30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/37]CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/36]LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2361715  (NOTETRY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11-17 * figures 1-5; claim - *;
 [X]GB2073257  (KENWOOD MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-17 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 9; figure - *;
 [X]EP1154064  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9-13,16,17 * figure -; claim - *;
 [XA]US2003037383  (BROKER JOHN F [US]) [X] 1,5,7-12,17 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figures 1,3; claim - * [A] 13-16;
 [A]US5930855  (VANDE HAAR EVAN R [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 41 - line 45; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE3741791
 EP0349789
 GB2361715