blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1703487

EP1703487 - Key having a balance weight; musical instrument, and method of assembling a balance weight in a key [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2007/27]
Former [2006/38]For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Izutani, Hitoshi
Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Yamashita, Noboru
Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Inoue, Satoshi
Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
 [2006/38]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2006/38]Wagner, Karl H.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06004242.102.03.2006
[2006/38]
Priority number, dateJP2005007222615.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005072226
JP2005008755825.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005087558
[2006/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1703487
Date:20.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1703487
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:G10D3/12, G10C3/12
[2017/07]
CPC:
G10C3/12 (EP,US); F25D3/14 (KR); F25D2201/12 (KR);
F25D2303/0832 (KR); F25D2303/0844 (KR)
Former IPC [2006/38]G10D3/12
Designated contracting states[2017/42]
Former [2006/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Taste mit einem Ausgleichsgewicht; Musikinstrument und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Taste mit einem Ausgleichsgewicht darin[2006/38]
English:Key having a balance weight; musical instrument, and method of assembling a balance weight in a key[2006/38]
French:Touche comprenant un élément de lestage; instrument de musique, et méthode d'assemblage d'un élément de lestage dans une touche[2006/38]
Examination procedure17.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
22.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200803   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2008
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001027712  (KANEMITSU MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0121]; figure 9b *;
 [X]JPS5323219U  (-) [X] 1-20 * figure 3b *;
 [I]US2003084776  (INOUE SATOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0061] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 5-7 *;
 [X]WO2005004106  (KAWAI MUSICAL INSTR MFG CO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0023] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2003047061  (KUGIMOTO HIDENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0024]; figure 4a *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.