Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1840844

EP1840844 - Secure radio frequency identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2013  [2013/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Datamars SA
Via ai Prati
6930 Bedano-Lugano / CH
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Mutti, Carlo
Via Cantonale
6945 Origlio / CH
02 / Malcarne, Enrico
In der Grueze, 7
8600 Dubendorf / CH
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Former [2007/40]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co.SA, Via Pioda, 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date06005461.617.03.2006
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateUS2006035689017.02.2006         Original published format: US 356890
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1840844
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1840844
Date:25.03.2009
[2009/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G07C9/00, G06K7/08
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
TitleGerman:Sicheres Radiofrequenzidentifikationssystem[2007/40]
English:Secure radio frequency identification system[2007/40]
French:Système sécurisé d'identification de fréquence radio[2007/40]
Examination procedure20.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
19.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/14]
16.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/14]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP1571591  (SWISSCOM MOBILE AG [CH]) [Y] 1-5,12-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0019] - [0025] * [A] 6-11,17-21;
 [A]WO0157807  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 19 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 21 - line 32 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 19 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 2 *;
 [A]US6422476  (ACKLEY H SPRAGUE [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 2 *;
 [A]WO9015211  (TLS TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003038172  (BODIN WILLIAM KRESS [US], et al);
 [A]DE102004013156  (ATMEL GERMANY GMBH [DE]);
 [A]US6252508  (VEGA VICTOR ALLEN [US], et al)
 [Y]  RAMANUJACHARY, ROMERO, Number Theory with Computer Appllications, PRENTICE-HALL, XP002417328 [Y] 1-5,12-16 * page 121 - page 122 *
by applicantEP0982688