Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1705106

EP1705106 - Method and apparatus for controlling the positioning of a part during manufacturing of joining/partially shaping motor vehicle body parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Drauz Nothelfer GmbH
Weipertstrasse 37
74076 Heilbronn / DE
[2006/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Reuter, Uwe
Enzmannstrasse 17
09112 Chemnitz / DE
02 / Stein, Hans
Wind 8
09337Hohenstein-Ernstthal OT Wüstenbrand / DE
 [2006/39]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Findeisen Neumann Scheit Partnerschaft mbB
Pornitzstraße 1
09112 Chemnitz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/39]Findeisen Hübner Neumann Seerig
Pornitzstraße 1
09112 Chemnitz / DE
Application number, filing date06005842.722.03.2006
[2006/39]
Priority number, dateDE2005101435424.03.2005         Original published format: DE102005014354
[2006/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1705106
Date:27.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1705106
Date:26.09.2007
[2007/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1705106
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:B62D65/02, B65D65/00
[2008/36]
Former International [2006/39]B62D65/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beeinflussung der Bauteillage bei der Herstellung von zu fügenden/partiell umzuformenden Kraftfahrzeugkarosseriebauteilen[2006/39]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling the positioning of a part during manufacturing of joining/partially shaping motor vehicle body parts[2006/39]
French:Méthode et appareil de contrôle du positionnement d'une pièce pendant la manufacture de l'assemblage/partiellement formage de pièces de carrosseries de véhicules automobiles[2006/39]
Examination procedure28.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/11]
03.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2011/16]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2011/02]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/30]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
AT22.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/13]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/01]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
LV11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
MC31.03.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1000699  (FATA AUTOMATION [IT]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *;
 [AP]DE10347553  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [AP] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE10242710  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0057]; claim 1 *