Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1710435 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1710435



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1797
11.05.2023 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.05.2023 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.05.2023 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
03.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.05.2023 Description Opposition 1
03.05.2023 English translation of the claims Opposition 4
03.05.2023 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.05.2023 French translation of claims Opposition 4
03.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.02.2023 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
27.02.2023 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 18
27.02.2023 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 18
27.02.2023 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 14
20.02.2022 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
16.02.2022 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.02.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
14.02.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.02.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.02.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
14.02.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
14.02.2022 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
17.01.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.01.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.12.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
21.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.11.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
22.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
15.09.2021 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
15.09.2021 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
10.09.2021 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.06.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.06.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.06.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.06.2021 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
04.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.06.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.05.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.05.2021 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
10.05.2021 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
10.05.2021 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
05.05.2021 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.04.2021 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.10.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.02.2020 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.10.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.10.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.09.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
16.09.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Appeal 13
23.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.05.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.01.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
07.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.01.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
28.08.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.08.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.08.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.08.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
02.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.06.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.06.2018 Claims Appeal 4
26.06.2018 Claims Appeal 4
26.06.2018 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2018 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.06.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
08.05.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.05.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
08.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 69
08.05.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
13.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
26.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
26.10.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
26.10.2017 Claims Opposition 3
26.10.2017 Claims Opposition 3
26.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
06.06.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Decision on the taking of evidence Opposition 2
02.02.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.02.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Summons to give evidence Opposition 3
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
07.12.2016 Decision on the taking of evidence Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.12.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Summons to give evidence Opposition 3
05.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
06.07.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 3
06.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.04.2015 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
05.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.02.2015 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
26.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.10.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.10.2014 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.10.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.10.2014 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
06.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
31.01.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
31.01.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.01.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.11.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.11.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.11.2013 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
21.10.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
21.10.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 3
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 3
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Claims Appeal 4
10.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
31.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
26.07.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
23.07.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.06.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.06.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
22.06.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.11.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.11.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
25.07.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.07.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.07.2011 Claims Appeal 4
05.07.2011 Claims Appeal 4
05.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
18.05.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
03.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.05.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.03.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
03.03.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.03.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
03.03.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 28
03.03.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 4
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 4
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 3
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 4
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 4
15.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
04.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.10.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.08.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
26.07.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.06.2010 General enquiry Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2009 General enquiry Opposition 1
23.09.2009 General enquiry Opposition 2
06.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
14.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
14.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
14.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.04.2009 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 10
01.04.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
16.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2009 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.02.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
06.02.2009 Claims Opposition 6
06.02.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
22.01.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.01.2009 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
31.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
31.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.10.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.10.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.05.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
26.07.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.07.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.07.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
10.07.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
23.03.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.03.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
07.03.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Description Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.09.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.06.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.06.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 1
09.06.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
23.03.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
23.03.2006 Description Search / examination 17
23.03.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.03.2006 Drawings Search / examination 5
23.03.2006 Priority document Search / examination 32
23.03.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6