Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1705894

EP1705894 - Device and method for taking still picture of selectable resolution while recording moving picture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Shin, Dae-Kyu Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2006/39]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06006024.123.03.2006
[2006/39]
Priority number, dateKR2005002452124.03.2005         Original published format: KR 20050024521
[2006/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1705894
Date:27.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/21
[2006/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/22]
Former [2006/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erfassen eines Standbildes von auswählbarer Auflösung während der Aufnahme eines Videos[2006/39]
English:Device and method for taking still picture of selectable resolution while recording moving picture[2006/39]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour la capture d'une image de résolution sélectionnable pendant la capture des images animées[2006/39]
Examination procedure23.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/39]
07.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination02.01.2015Appeal received No.  T1009/15
02.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP17179883.8  / EP3247099
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
18.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
01.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2003112347  (WYMAN BLAIR) [X] 1,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0056] * [A] 12;
 [Y]US2004218059  (OBRADOR PERE ET AL) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0022]; figure - *;
 [Y]US2002024602  (JUEN MASAHIRO) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0037] - [0049] - [0096] , [0117] *;
 [Y]US2004212694  (MIKI SHIGERU [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] - [0054] - [0063] *;
 [A]US2004189823  (SHIBUTANI ATSUSHI) [A] 1-3,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] *;
 [A]US2003095191  (SAITO OSAMU) [A] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] *
 [Y]  - "Digitalkameras - Checkliste", C'T MAGAZIN FÜR COMPUTERTECHNIK, Hannover, Germany, (20030823), vol. 18, pages 141 - 145, XP002386443 [Y] 1 * the whole document *